CA ACA8 | 2011-2012 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Strong Partisan Bill (Republican 13-1)
Status: Introduced on December 6 2010 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2011-04-25 - Re-referred to Com. on BUDGET.
Pending: Assembly Budget Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on December 6 2010 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2011-04-25 - Re-referred to Com. on BUDGET.
Pending: Assembly Budget Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
A resolution to propose to the people of the State of California an amendment to the Constitution of the State, by amending, repealing, and adding Section 12 of Article IV thereof, relating to the state budget.
Title
State Budget.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2011-04-25 | Re-referred to Com. on BUDGET. | |
2011-04-14 | Referred to Com. on BUDGET. From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on BUDGET. Read second time and amended. | |
2010-12-07 | From printer. May be heard in committee January 6. | |
2010-12-06 | Read first time. To print. |