CA ACR106 | 2011-2012 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 51-21)
Status: Passed on May 31 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-05-31 - Chaptered by Secretary of State - Res. Chapter 33, Statutes of 2012.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 51-21)
Status: Passed on May 31 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-05-31 - Chaptered by Secretary of State - Res. Chapter 33, Statutes of 2012.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Relative to "Parks Make Life Better!(R)" Month.
Title
Parks Make Life Better! Month.(R)
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2012-05-25 - Senate - W/O REF. TO FILE ACR106 Smyth (Y: 33 N: 0 NV: 7 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-03-22 - Assembly - From committee: Be adopted. To third reading (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2012-03-22 - Assembly - From committee: Be adopted. To third reading (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2012-05-31 | Chaptered by Secretary of State - Res. Chapter 33, Statutes of 2012. | |
2012-05-31 | Enrolled and filed with the Secretary of State at 11:45 a.m. | |
2012-05-25 | In Assembly. Ordered to Engrossing and Enrolling. | |
2012-05-25 | Withdrawn from committee. Ordered to special consent calendar. Adopted and to Assembly. (Ayes 33. Noes 0. Page 3620.) | |
2012-03-27 | In Senate. To Com. on RLS. | |
2012-03-26 | Amended, adopted, and to Senate. (Page 4129.) | |
2012-03-22 | From committee: Be adopted. Ordered to third reading. (Ayes 8. Noes 0.) (March 22). | |
2012-02-23 | Referred to Com. on RLS. | |
2012-02-10 | From printer. | |
2012-02-09 | Introduced. To print. |