CA ACR123 | 2015-2016 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on August 16 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-08-16 - Chaptered by Secretary of State - Res. Chapter 119, Statutes of 2016.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on August 16 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-08-16 - Chaptered by Secretary of State - Res. Chapter 119, Statutes of 2016.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Relative to the Sheriff's Deputies Ronald Wayne Ives and Daniel Jess Lobo, Jr., Memorial Highway.
Title
Sheriff's Deputies Ronald Wayne Ives and Daniel Jess
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2016-08-11 - Senate - Consent Calendar 2nd ACR123 Steinorth (Y: 37 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-04-11 - Assembly - ACR 123 STEINORTH Consent Calendar Second Day Regular Session (Y: 77 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2016-04-06 - Assembly - Be adopted, to Consent Calendar (Y: 18 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2016-03-14 - Assembly - Be adopted and re-referred to the Committee on Appropriations with recommendation: To Consent Calendar (Y: 16 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-04-11 - Assembly - ACR 123 STEINORTH Consent Calendar Second Day Regular Session (Y: 77 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2016-04-06 - Assembly - Be adopted, to Consent Calendar (Y: 18 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2016-03-14 - Assembly - Be adopted and re-referred to the Committee on Appropriations with recommendation: To Consent Calendar (Y: 16 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-08-16 | Assembly | Chaptered by Secretary of State - Res. Chapter 119, Statutes of 2016. |
2016-08-16 | Assembly | Enrolled and filed with the Secretary of State at 2:30 p.m. |
2016-08-11 | Assembly | In Assembly. Ordered to Engrossing and Enrolling. |
2016-08-11 | Senate | Adopted and to Assembly. (Ayes 37. Noes 0. Page 4875.) |
2016-08-02 | Senate | Read second time. Ordered to Consent Calendar. |
2016-08-01 | Senate | From committee: Be placed on second reading file pursuant to Senate Rule 28.8 and ordered to consent calendar. |
2016-06-29 | Senate | From committee: Be adopted, and re-refer to Com. on APPR. with recommendation: To Consent Calendar. (Ayes 10. Noes 0.) (June 28). Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2016-04-28 | Senate | Re-referred to Com. on T. & H. |
2016-04-11 | Senate | In Senate. To Com. on RLS. |
2016-04-11 | Assembly | Adopted and to Senate. (Ayes 77. Noes 0. Page 4265.) |
2016-04-06 | Assembly | From committee: Be adopted. To Consent Calendar. (Ayes 18. Noes 0.) (April 6). |
2016-03-15 | Assembly | From committee: Be adopted, and re-refer to Com. on APPR. with recommendation: To Consent Calendar. (Ayes 16. Noes 0.) (March 14). Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2016-02-23 | Assembly | Re-referred to Com. on TRANS. |
2016-02-22 | Assembly | From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on TRANS. Amended. |
2016-01-25 | Assembly | Referred to Com. on TRANS. |
2016-01-22 | Assembly | From printer. |
2016-01-21 | Assembly | Introduced. To print. |