CA ACR130 | 2011-2012 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 50-23)
Status: Passed on May 21 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-05-21 - Chaptered by Secretary of State - Res. Chapter 26, Statutes of 2012.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 50-23)
Status: Passed on May 21 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-05-21 - Chaptered by Secretary of State - Res. Chapter 26, Statutes of 2012.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Relative to California Public Safety Telecommunicators Week.
Title
California Public Safety Telecommunicators Week.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2012-05-17 - Senate - W/O REF. TO FILE ACR130 Torres (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-03-29 - Assembly - From committee: Be adopted. To third reading (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2012-03-29 - Assembly - From committee: Be adopted. To third reading (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2012-05-21 | Chaptered by Secretary of State - Res. Chapter 26, Statutes of 2012. | |
2012-05-21 | Enrolled and filed with the Secretary of State at 2:45 p.m. | |
2012-05-17 | In Assembly. Ordered to Engrossing and Enrolling. | |
2012-05-17 | Withdrawn from committee. Ordered to special consent calendar. Adopted and to Assembly. (Ayes 38. Noes 0. Page 3531.) | |
2012-04-10 | In Senate. To Com. on RLS. | |
2012-04-09 | Amended, adopted, and to Senate. (Page 4248.) | |
2012-03-29 | From committee: Be adopted. Ordered to third reading. (Ayes 10. Noes 0.) (March 29). | |
2012-03-22 | Referred to Com. on RLS. | |
2012-03-16 | From printer. | |
2012-03-15 | Introduced. To print. |