CA ACR146 | 2011-2012 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 45-20)
Status: Passed on June 1 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-06-01 - Chaptered by Secretary of State - Res. Chapter 41, Statutes of 2012.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 45-20)
Status: Passed on June 1 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-06-01 - Chaptered by Secretary of State - Res. Chapter 41, Statutes of 2012.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Relative to Cinco de Mayo Week.
Title
Cinco de Mayo Week.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2012-05-29 - Senate - Assembly 3rd Reading ACR146 Lara By Calderon (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-05-03 - Assembly - From committee: Be adopted. To third reading (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2012-05-03 - Assembly - From committee: Be adopted. To third reading (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2012-06-01 | Chaptered by Secretary of State - Res. Chapter 41, Statutes of 2012. | |
2012-06-01 | Enrolled and filed with the Secretary of State at 2:30 p.m. | |
2012-05-30 | In Assembly. Ordered to Engrossing and Enrolling. | |
2012-05-29 | Adopted and to Assembly. (Ayes 39. Noes 0. Page 3658.) | |
2012-05-23 | Withdrawn from committee. Ordered to third reading. | |
2012-05-08 | In Senate. To Com. on RLS. | |
2012-05-07 | Amended, adopted, and to Senate. (Page 4697.) | |
2012-05-03 | From committee: Be adopted. Ordered to third reading. (Ayes 9. Noes 0.) (May 3). | |
2012-04-26 | Referred to Com. on RLS. | |
2012-04-24 | From printer. | |
2012-04-23 | Introduced. To print. |