CA ACR152 | 2009-2010 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 44-25)
Status: Passed on September 14 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-09-14 - Chaptered by Secretary of State - Res. Chapter 150, Statutes of 2010.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 44-25)
Status: Passed on September 14 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-09-14 - Chaptered by Secretary of State - Res. Chapter 150, Statutes of 2010.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Relative to vehicles.
Title
Vehicles: automotive aftermarket: National Car Care
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2010-08-26 - Senate - W/O REF. TO FILE ACR152 Hernandez (Y: 34 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2010-04-22 - Assembly - Be adopted as amended (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2010-04-22 - Assembly - Be adopted as amended (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-09-14 | Chaptered by Secretary of State - Res. Chapter 150, Statutes of 2010. | |
2010-09-14 | Enrolled and filed with the Secretary of State at 4:30 p.m. | |
2010-08-30 | In Assembly. To enrollment. | |
2010-08-26 | Withdrawn from committee. Ordered to Special Consent Calendar. Adopted and to Assembly. (Ayes 34. Noes 0. Page 4942.) | |
2010-05-03 | In Senate. To Com. on RLS. | |
2010-04-29 | Amended, adopted, and to Senate. (Page 4936.) | |
2010-04-26 | Amended. To third reading. | |
2010-04-22 | From committee: Amend, and be adopted as amended. (Ayes 8. Noes 0.) (April 22). | |
2010-04-12 | Referred to Com. on RULES. | |
2010-04-08 | From printer. | |
2010-04-07 | Introduced. To print. |