CA ACR152 | 2023-2024 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 57-13)
Status: Passed on July 2 2024 - 100% progression
Action: 2024-07-02 - Chaptered by Secretary of State - Res. Chapter 137, Statutes of 2024.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 57-13)
Status: Passed on July 2 2024 - 100% progression
Action: 2024-07-02 - Chaptered by Secretary of State - Res. Chapter 137, Statutes of 2024.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Relative to California Mountain Biking Month.
Title
California Mountain Biking Month.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2024-06-20 - Senate - Special Consent ACR152 Connolly et al (Y: 36 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2024-05-28 - Assembly - Be adopted. To third reading (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2024-05-28 - Assembly - Be adopted. To third reading (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-07-02 | Chaptered by Secretary of State - Res. Chapter 137, Statutes of 2024. | |
2024-07-02 | Enrolled and filed with the Secretary of State at 3 p.m. | |
2024-06-20 | Assembly | In Assembly. Ordered to Engrossing and Enrolling. |
2024-06-20 | Senate | Adopted and to Assembly. (Ayes 36. Noes 0.) |
2024-06-18 | Senate | Ordered to special consent calendar. |
2024-06-12 | Senate | From committee: Ordered to third reading. |
2024-06-04 | Senate | In Senate. To Com. on RLS. |
2024-06-03 | Assembly | Adopted and to Senate. |
2024-06-03 | Assembly | Coauthors revised. |
2024-05-28 | Assembly | From committee: Be adopted. Ordered to Third Reading. (Ayes 6. Noes 0.) (May 28). |
2024-05-28 | Assembly | Coauthors revised. |
2024-03-04 | Assembly | Referred to Com. on RLS. |
2024-02-29 | Assembly | From printer. |
2024-02-28 | Assembly | Introduced. To print. |