CA ACR158 | 2013-2014 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on September 11 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-09-11 - Chaptered by Secretary of State - Res. Chapter 176, Statutes of 2014.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on September 11 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-09-11 - Chaptered by Secretary of State - Res. Chapter 176, Statutes of 2014.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Relative to the CHP Officers Brian M. Law and Juan J. Gonzalez Memorial Highway.
Title
The CHP Officers Brian M. Law and Juan J. Gonzalez
Sponsors
Asm. Henry Perea [D] |
Roll Calls
2014-08-27 - Senate - Consent Calendar 2nd ACR158 Perea (Y: 36 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-08-04 - Assembly - ACR 158 PEREA Consent Calendar Second Day Regular Session (Y: 78 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2014-07-02 - Assembly - Be adopted, to Consent Calendar (Y: 17 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-06-23 - Assembly - Be adopted, and re-refer to Committee on Appropriations with recommendation: To Consent Calendar (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2014-08-04 - Assembly - ACR 158 PEREA Consent Calendar Second Day Regular Session (Y: 78 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2014-07-02 - Assembly - Be adopted, to Consent Calendar (Y: 17 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-06-23 - Assembly - Be adopted, and re-refer to Committee on Appropriations with recommendation: To Consent Calendar (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-09-11 | Assembly | Chaptered by Secretary of State - Res. Chapter 176, Statutes of 2014. |
2014-09-11 | Assembly | Enrolled and filed with the Secretary of State at 4 p.m. |
2014-08-27 | Assembly | In Assembly. Ordered to Engrossing and Enrolling. |
2014-08-27 | Senate | Adopted and to Assembly. (Ayes 36. Noes 0. Page 4903.) |
2014-08-22 | Senate | Read second time. Ordered to consent calendar. |
2014-08-21 | Senate | From committee: Be placed on second reading file pursuant to Senate Rule 28.8 and ordered to consent calendar. |
2014-08-12 | Senate | From committee: Be adopted and re-refer to Com. on APPR. with recommendation: to consent calendar. (Ayes 11. Noes 0.) (August 12). Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2014-08-05 | Senate | Re-referred to Com. on T. & H. |
2014-08-04 | Senate | In Senate. To Com. on RLS. |
2014-08-04 | Assembly | Adopted and to Senate. (Ayes 78. Noes 0. Page 5849.) |
2014-07-02 | Assembly | From committee: Be adopted. To Consent Calendar. (Ayes 17. Noes 0.) (July 2). |
2014-06-24 | Assembly | From committee: Be adopted and re-refer to Com. on APPR. with recommendation: to consent calendar. (Ayes 13. Noes 0.) (June 23). Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2014-06-12 | Assembly | Referred to Com. on TRANS. |
2014-06-06 | Assembly | From printer. |
2014-06-05 | Assembly | Introduced. To print. |