CA ACR166 | 2023-2024 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 55-12)
Status: Passed on July 18 2024 - 100% progression
Action: 2024-07-18 - Chaptered by Secretary of State - Res. Chapter 151, Statutes of 2024.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 55-12)
Status: Passed on July 18 2024 - 100% progression
Action: 2024-07-18 - Chaptered by Secretary of State - Res. Chapter 151, Statutes of 2024.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Relative to the federal Indian Citizenship Act of 1924.
Title
The Indian Citizenship Act of 1924.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2024-07-01 - Assembly - ACR 166 Ramos Concurrence in Senate Amendments (Y: 73 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2024-06-20 - Senate - Special Consent ACR166 Ramos et al (Y: 36 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2024-05-28 - Assembly - Be adopted. To third reading (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2024-06-20 - Senate - Special Consent ACR166 Ramos et al (Y: 36 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2024-05-28 - Assembly - Be adopted. To third reading (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-07-18 | Chaptered by Secretary of State - Res. Chapter 151, Statutes of 2024. | |
2024-07-18 | Enrolled and filed with the Secretary of State at 3 p.m. | |
2024-07-01 | Assembly | Senate amendments concurred in. To Engrossing and Enrolling. |
2024-06-20 | Assembly | In Assembly. Concurrence in Senate amendments pending. |
2024-06-20 | Senate | Adopted and to Assembly. (Ayes 36. Noes 0.) |
2024-06-18 | Senate | Ordered to special consent calendar. |
2024-06-12 | Senate | From committee: Ordered to third reading. |
2024-06-10 | Senate | From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to committee. Read second time, amended, and re-referred to Com. on RLS. |
2024-06-04 | Senate | In Senate. To Com. on RLS. |
2024-06-03 | Assembly | Adopted and to Senate. |
2024-06-03 | Assembly | Coauthors revised. |
2024-05-28 | Assembly | From committee: Be adopted. Ordered to Third Reading. (Ayes 6. Noes 0.) (May 28). |
2024-04-08 | Assembly | Referred to Com. on RLS. |
2024-04-03 | Assembly | From printer. |
2024-04-02 | Assembly | Introduced. To print. |