CA ACR179 | 2017-2018 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on August 21 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-08-21 - Chaptered by Secretary of State - Res. Chapter 161, Statutes of 2018.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on August 21 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-08-21 - Chaptered by Secretary of State - Res. Chapter 161, Statutes of 2018.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Relative to the Deputy Sheriff Robert “Bob” Paris, Jr., Memorial Highway.
Title
Deputy Sheriff Robert “Bob” Paris, Jr., Memorial Highway.
Sponsors
Asm. Heath Flora [R] |
Roll Calls
2018-08-13 - Senate - Consent Calendar ACR179 (Y: 37 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-07-03 - Senate - Be adopted, but first be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] with recommendation: To Consent Calendar (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-04-12 - Assembly - ACR 179 FLORA Consent Calendar Second Day Regular Session (Y: 68 N: 0 NV: 9 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-04-09 - Assembly - Be adopted. To Consent Calendar (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-07-03 - Senate - Be adopted, but first be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] with recommendation: To Consent Calendar (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-04-12 - Assembly - ACR 179 FLORA Consent Calendar Second Day Regular Session (Y: 68 N: 0 NV: 9 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-04-09 - Assembly - Be adopted. To Consent Calendar (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-08-21 | Assembly | Chaptered by Secretary of State - Res. Chapter 161, Statutes of 2018. |
2018-08-21 | Assembly | Enrolled and filed with the Secretary of State at 10 a.m. |
2018-08-14 | Assembly | In Assembly. Ordered to Engrossing and Enrolling. |
2018-08-13 | Senate | Adopted and to Assembly. (Ayes 37. Noes 0. Page 5278.) |
2018-08-07 | Senate | Read second time. Ordered to Consent Calendar. |
2018-08-06 | Senate | From committee: Be ordered to second reading file pursuant to Senate Rule 28.8 and ordered to Consent Calendar. |
2018-07-03 | Senate | From committee: Be adopted, and re-refer to Com. on APPR. with recommendation: To Consent Calendar. (Ayes 12. Noes 0.) (July 3). Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2018-04-25 | Senate | Re-referred to Com. on T. & H. |
2018-04-12 | Senate | In Senate. To Com. on RLS. |
2018-04-12 | Assembly | Adopted and to Senate. (Ayes 68. Noes 0. Page 4646.) |
2018-04-10 | Assembly | From committee: Be adopted. To Consent Calendar. (Ayes 12. Noes 0.) (April 9). |
2018-03-20 | Assembly | Re-referred to Com. on TRANS. |
2018-03-19 | Assembly | From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on TRANS. Amended. |
2018-03-01 | Assembly | Referred to Com. on TRANS. |
2018-02-21 | Assembly | From printer. |
2018-02-20 | Assembly | Introduced. To print. |