CA ACR18 | 2009-2010 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 48-25)
Status: Passed on April 21 2009 - 100% progression
Action: 2009-04-21 - Chaptered by Secretary of State - Res. Chapter 16, Statutes of 2009.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 48-25)
Status: Passed on April 21 2009 - 100% progression
Action: 2009-04-21 - Chaptered by Secretary of State - Res. Chapter 16, Statutes of 2009.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Relative to Lyme Disease Awareness Month.
Title
Lyme Disease Awareness Month.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2009-04-16 - Senate - W/O REF. TO FILE ACR18 Chesbro (Y: 37 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2009-03-23 - Assembly - From committee: Be adopted. To third reading (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2009-03-23 - Assembly - From committee: Be adopted. To third reading (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2009-04-21 | Chaptered by Secretary of State - Res. Chapter 16, Statutes of 2009. | |
2009-04-21 | Enrolled and filed with the Secretary of State at 2:45 p.m. | |
2009-04-16 | In Assembly. To enrollment. | |
2009-04-16 | Withdrawn from committee. Ordered to Special Consent Calendar. Adopted and to Assembly. (Ayes 37. Noes 0. Page 520.) | |
2009-03-31 | In Senate. To Com. on RLS. | |
2009-03-26 | Amended, adopted, and to Senate. (Page 678.) | |
2009-03-23 | From committee: Be adopted. To third reading. (Ayes 9. Noes 0.) (March 23). | |
2009-03-11 | Re-referred to Com. on RULES. | |
2009-03-10 | From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on RULES. Amended. | |
2009-02-23 | Referred to Com. on RULES. | |
2009-02-04 | From printer. | |
2009-02-03 | Introduced. To print. |