CA ACR182 | 2023-2024 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 7-3)
Status: Engrossed on June 10 2024 - 50% progression
Action: 2024-06-20 - Ordered to inactive file at the request of Senator Jones.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on June 10 2024 - 50% progression
Action: 2024-06-20 - Ordered to inactive file at the request of Senator Jones.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Relative to ocean pollution.
Title
The Great Pacific Garbage Patch.
Sponsors
Asm. Diane Dixon [R] | Asm. Juan Alanis [R] | Asm. Phillip Chen [R] | Asm. Laurie Davies [R] |
Asm. Heath Flora [R] | Asm. Tom Lackey [R] | Sen. Josh Newman [D] | Asm. Liz Ortega [D] |
Asm. Gail Pellerin [D] | Asm. Marie Waldron [R] |
Roll Calls
2024-06-03 - Assembly - Be adopted. To third reading (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-06-20 | Senate | Ordered to inactive file at the request of Senator Jones. |
2024-06-19 | Senate | From committee: Ordered to third reading. |
2024-06-10 | Senate | In Senate. To Com. on RLS. |
2024-06-10 | Assembly | Adopted and to Senate. |
2024-06-03 | Assembly | From committee: Be adopted. Ordered to Third Reading. (Ayes 6. Noes 0.) (June 3). |
2024-06-03 | Assembly | Coauthors revised. |
2024-06-03 | Assembly | Referred to Com. on RLS. |
2024-04-23 | Assembly | From printer. |
2024-04-22 | Assembly | Introduced. To print. |