CA ACR183 | 2009-2010 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 6-2)
Status: Passed on September 16 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-09-16 - Chaptered by Secretary of State - Res. Chapter 170, Statutes of 2010.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 6-2)
Status: Passed on September 16 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-09-16 - Chaptered by Secretary of State - Res. Chapter 170, Statutes of 2010.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Relative to California Adoption Month.
Title
California Adoption Month.
Sponsors
Asm. Juan Arambula [D] | Asm. Karen Bass [D] | Asm. Mike Davis [D] | Sen. Bill Emmerson [R] |
Sen. Noreen Evans [D] | Asm. Nathan Fletcher [R] | Sen. Carol Liu [D] | Sen. Anthony Portantino [D] |
Roll Calls
2010-08-27 - Senate - W/O REF. TO FILE ACR183 Fletcher (Y: 34 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2010-08-12 - Assembly - From committee: Be adopted. To third reading (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2010-08-12 - Assembly - From committee: Be adopted. To third reading (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-09-16 | Chaptered by Secretary of State - Res. Chapter 170, Statutes of 2010. | |
2010-09-16 | Enrolled and filed with the Secretary of State at 3:15 p.m. | |
2010-08-30 | In Assembly. To enrollment. | |
2010-08-27 | Withdrawn from committee. Ordered to Special Consent Calendar. Adopted and to Assembly. (Ayes 34. Noes 0. Page 4980.) | |
2010-08-24 | In Senate. To Com. on RLS. | |
2010-08-23 | Adopted and to Senate. (Page 6491.) | |
2010-08-19 | Assembly Rule 69(d) suspended. (Page 6352.) | |
2010-08-18 | Amended. To third reading. | |
2010-08-12 | From committee: Be adopted. To third reading. (Ayes 9. Noes 0.) (August 12). | |
2010-08-05 | Referred to Com. on RULES. | |
2010-08-04 | From printer. | |
2010-08-03 | Introduced. To print. |