CA ACR187 | 2015-2016 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 46-19)
Status: Passed on July 11 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-07-11 - Chaptered by Secretary of State - Res. Chapter 90, Statutes of 2016.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 46-19)
Status: Passed on July 11 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-07-11 - Chaptered by Secretary of State - Res. Chapter 90, Statutes of 2016.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Relative to American Stroke Month.
Title
American Stroke Month.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2016-06-30 - Senate - Special Consent # ACR187 Gomez (Y: 37 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-05-27 - Assembly - From committee: Be adopted. To third reading (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2016-05-27 - Assembly - From committee: Be adopted. To third reading (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-07-11 | Assembly | Chaptered by Secretary of State - Res. Chapter 90, Statutes of 2016. |
2016-07-11 | Assembly | Enrolled and filed with the Secretary of State at 2:30 p.m. |
2016-06-30 | Assembly | In Assembly. Ordered to Engrossing and Enrolling. |
2016-06-30 | Senate | Adopted and to Assembly. (Ayes 37. Noes 0. Page 4655.) |
2016-06-22 | Senate | Ordered to special consent calendar. |
2016-06-09 | Senate | From committee: Ordered to third reading. |
2016-06-02 | Senate | In Senate. To Com. on RLS. |
2016-05-31 | Assembly | Amended, adopted, and to Senate. (Page 5016.) |
2016-05-27 | Assembly | From committee: Be adopted. Ordered to Third Reading. (Ayes 10. Noes 0.) (May 27). |
2016-05-19 | Assembly | Referred to Com. on RLS. |
2016-05-18 | Assembly | From printer. |
2016-05-17 | Assembly | Introduced. To print. |