CA ACR205 | 2023-2024 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 61-16)
Status: Passed on August 19 2024 - 100% progression
Action: 2024-08-19 - Chaptered by Secretary of State - Res. Chapter 167, Statutes of 2024.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 61-16)
Status: Passed on August 19 2024 - 100% progression
Action: 2024-08-19 - Chaptered by Secretary of State - Res. Chapter 167, Statutes of 2024.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Relative to Portuguese Heritage Month.
Title
Portuguese Heritage Month: Day of Portugal: Day of the Azores.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2024-08-08 - Senate - Special Consent ACR205 Aguiar-Curry et al (Y: 37 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2024-06-17 - Assembly - Be adopted. To third reading (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2024-06-17 - Assembly - Be adopted. To third reading (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-08-19 | Chaptered by Secretary of State - Res. Chapter 167, Statutes of 2024. | |
2024-08-19 | Enrolled and filed with the Secretary of State at 3 p.m. | |
2024-08-13 | Assembly | Enrolled measure version corrected. |
2024-08-08 | Assembly | In Assembly. Ordered to Engrossing and Enrolling. |
2024-08-08 | Senate | Adopted and to Assembly. (Ayes 37. Noes 0.) |
2024-08-06 | Senate | Ordered to special consent calendar. |
2024-07-03 | Senate | From committee: Ordered to third reading. |
2024-06-25 | Senate | In Senate. To Com. on RLS. |
2024-06-24 | Assembly | Adopted and to Senate. |
2024-06-24 | Assembly | Coauthors revised. |
2024-06-17 | Assembly | From committee: Be adopted. Ordered to Third Reading. (Ayes 10. Noes 0.) (June 17). |
2024-05-28 | Assembly | Referred to Com. on RLS. |
2024-05-23 | Assembly | From printer. |
2024-05-22 | Assembly | Introduced. To print. |