CA ACR33 | 2017-2018 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 49-21)
Status: Passed on April 26 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-04-26 - Chaptered by Secretary of State - Res. Chapter 35, Statutes of 2017.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 49-21)
Status: Passed on April 26 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-04-26 - Chaptered by Secretary of State - Res. Chapter 35, Statutes of 2017.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Relative to Latino Education and Advocacy Week.
Title
Latino Education and Advocacy Week.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2017-04-24 - Senate - Special Consent Calendar # ACR33 (Y: 37 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-03-20 - Assembly - Be adopted. To third reading (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-03-20 - Assembly - Be adopted. To third reading (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-04-26 | Assembly | Chaptered by Secretary of State - Res. Chapter 35, Statutes of 2017. |
2017-04-26 | Assembly | Enrolled and filed with the Secretary of State at 2:35 p.m. |
2017-04-24 | Assembly | In Assembly. Ordered to Engrossing and Enrolling. |
2017-04-24 | Senate | Adopted and to Assembly. (Ayes 37. Noes 0. Page 804.) |
2017-04-19 | Senate | Ordered to special consent calendar. |
2017-04-06 | Senate | From committee: Ordered to third reading. |
2017-04-03 | Senate | In Senate. To Com. on RLS. |
2017-03-30 | Assembly | Adopted and to Senate. (Page 838.) |
2017-03-30 | Assembly | Coauthors revised. |
2017-03-23 | Assembly | Amended. Ordered to third reading. |
2017-03-20 | Assembly | From committee: Be adopted. Ordered to Third Reading. (Ayes 11. Noes 0.) (March 20). |
2017-03-16 | Assembly | Referred to Com. on RLS. |
2017-03-14 | Assembly | From printer. |
2017-03-13 | Assembly | Introduced. To print. |