CA ACR37 | 2009-2010 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 51-28)
Status: Passed on May 28 2009 - 100% progression
Action: 2009-05-28 - Chaptered by Secretary of State - Res. Chapter 35, Statutes of 2009.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 51-28)
Status: Passed on May 28 2009 - 100% progression
Action: 2009-05-28 - Chaptered by Secretary of State - Res. Chapter 35, Statutes of 2009.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Relative to California Public Safety Telecommunicators Week.
Title
California Public Safety Telecommunicators Week.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2009-05-26 - Senate - Assembly 3rd Reading ACR37 Torres Ducheny (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2009-04-02 - Assembly - From committee: Be adopted. To third reading (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2009-04-02 - Assembly - From committee: Be adopted. To third reading (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2009-05-28 | Chaptered by Secretary of State - Res. Chapter 35, Statutes of 2009. | |
2009-05-28 | Enrolled and filed with the Secretary of State at 2:15 p.m. | |
2009-05-26 | In Assembly. To enrollment. | |
2009-05-26 | Adopted and to Assembly. (Ayes 39. Noes 0. Page 1004.) | |
2009-05-21 | Withdrawn from committee. Ordered placed on third reading file. | |
2009-04-15 | In Senate. To Com. on RLS. | |
2009-04-13 | Adopted and to Senate. (Page 822.) Action rescinded whereby the resolution was adopted and to Senate. Amended, adopted, and to Senate. (Page 823.) (Corrected April 21.) | |
2009-04-02 | From committee: Be adopted. To third reading. (Ayes 10. Noes 0.) (April 2). | |
2009-04-01 | Re-referred to Com. on RULES. | |
2009-03-31 | From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on RULES. Amended. | |
2009-03-12 | Referred to Com. on RULES. | |
2009-02-27 | From printer. | |
2009-02-26 | Introduced. To print. |