CA ACR39 | 2011-2012 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on June 27 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-06-27 - Chaptered by Secretary of State - Res. Chapter 40, Statutes of 2011.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on June 27 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-06-27 - Chaptered by Secretary of State - Res. Chapter 40, Statutes of 2011.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Relative to Deputy Dennis "Skip" Sullivan Memorial Bridge.
Title
Deputy Dennis "Skip" Sullivan Memorial Bridge.
Sponsors
Sen. Jim Nielsen [R] |
Roll Calls
2011-06-23 - Senate - Consent Calendar 2nd ACR39 Nielsen (Y: 36 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-06-14 - Senate - Be adopted and be placed on the Consent Calendar (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-05-19 - Assembly - ACR 39 NIELSEN Assembly Third Reading (Y: 73 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2011-05-11 - Assembly - From committee: Be adopted. To third reading (Y: 15 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2011-05-02 - Assembly - Be adopted and be re-referred to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 13 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-06-14 - Senate - Be adopted and be placed on the Consent Calendar (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-05-19 - Assembly - ACR 39 NIELSEN Assembly Third Reading (Y: 73 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2011-05-11 - Assembly - From committee: Be adopted. To third reading (Y: 15 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2011-05-02 - Assembly - Be adopted and be re-referred to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 13 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2011-06-27 | Chaptered by Secretary of State - Res. Chapter 40, Statutes of 2011. | |
2011-06-27 | Enrolled and filed with the Secretary of State at 2:05 p.m. | |
2011-06-23 | In Assembly. Ordered to Engrossing and Enrolling. | |
2011-06-23 | Adopted and to Assembly. (Ayes 36. Noes 0. Page 1536.) | |
2011-06-16 | Read second time. Ordered to consent calendar. | |
2011-06-15 | From committee: Be adopted. To Consent Calendar. (Ayes 8. Noes 0.) (June 14). | |
2011-06-02 | Re-referred to Com. on T. & H. | |
2011-05-19 | In Senate. To Com. on RLS. | |
2011-05-19 | Adopted and to Senate. (Ayes 73. Noes 1. Page 1440.) | |
2011-05-12 | From committee: Be adopted. Ordered to third reading. (Ayes 15. Noes 1.) (May 11). | |
2011-05-03 | From committee: Be adopted, and re-refer to Com. on APPR. Re-referred. (Ayes 13. Noes 1.) (May 2). Re-referred to Com. on APPR. | |
2011-03-25 | Referred to Com. on TRANS. | |
2011-03-22 | From printer. | |
2011-03-21 | Introduced. To print. |