CA ACR5 | 2011-2012 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 53-21)
Status: Engrossed on January 20 2011 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2011-01-24 - In Senate. To Com. on RLS.
Pending: Senate Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on January 20 2011 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2011-01-24 - In Senate. To Com. on RLS.
Pending: Senate Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Relative to Martin Luther King, Jr. Day.
Title
Martin Luther King, Jr. Day.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2011-01-18 - Assembly - From committee: Be adopted. To third reading (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2011-01-24 | In Senate. To Com. on RLS. | |
2011-01-20 | Amended, adopted, and to Senate. (Page 196.) | |
2011-01-18 | Referred to Com. on RLS. From committee: Be adopted. Ordered to third reading. (Ayes 11. Noes 0.) (January 18). | |
2011-01-13 | From printer. | |
2011-01-12 | Introduced. To print. |