CA ACR53 | 2009-2010 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 46-29)
Status: Passed on May 20 2009 - 100% progression
Action: 2009-05-20 - Chaptered by Secretary of State - Res. Chapter 30, Statutes of 2009.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 46-29)
Status: Passed on May 20 2009 - 100% progression
Action: 2009-05-20 - Chaptered by Secretary of State - Res. Chapter 30, Statutes of 2009.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Relative to Autism Awareness Month.
Title
Autism Awareness Month.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2009-05-14 - Senate - W/O REF. TO FILE ACR53 Price (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2009-04-23 - Assembly - From committee: Be adopted. To third reading (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2009-04-23 - Assembly - From committee: Be adopted. To third reading (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2009-05-20 | Chaptered by Secretary of State - Res. Chapter 30, Statutes of 2009. | |
2009-05-20 | Enrolled and filed with the Secretary of State at 3:30 p.m. | |
2009-05-14 | In Assembly. To enrollment. | |
2009-05-14 | Withdrawn from committee. Ordered to Special Consent Calendar. Adopted and to Assembly. (Ayes 38. Noes 0. Page 900.) | |
2009-04-28 | In Senate. To Com. on RLS. | |
2009-04-27 | Amended, adopted, and to Senate. (Page 111.) | |
2009-04-23 | From committee: Be adopted. To third reading. (Ayes 8. Noes 0.) (April 23). | |
2009-04-13 | Re-referred to Com. on RULES. | |
2009-04-02 | Referred to Com. on RULES. From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on RULES. Amended. | |
2009-03-23 | Introduced. To print. |