CA ACR56 | 2015-2016 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 3-1)
Status: Passed on September 21 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-09-21 - Chaptered by Secretary of State - Res. Chapter 184, Statutes of 2015.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 3-1)
Status: Passed on September 21 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-09-21 - Chaptered by Secretary of State - Res. Chapter 184, Statutes of 2015.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Relative to the official State Pet.
Title
Official State Pet.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2015-09-03 - Assembly - ACR 56 LINDER Concurrence in Senate Amendments (Y: 78 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2015-09-02 - Senate - Assembly 3rd Reading ACR56 Linder By Allen (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-07-16 - Assembly - ACR 56 LINDER Consent Calendar Second Day Regular Session (Y: 79 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2015-07-08 - Assembly - Be adopted, to Consent Calendar (Y: 20 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2015-09-02 - Senate - Assembly 3rd Reading ACR56 Linder By Allen (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-07-16 - Assembly - ACR 56 LINDER Consent Calendar Second Day Regular Session (Y: 79 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2015-07-08 - Assembly - Be adopted, to Consent Calendar (Y: 20 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-09-21 | Assembly | Chaptered by Secretary of State - Res. Chapter 184, Statutes of 2015. |
2015-09-21 | Assembly | Enrolled and filed with the Secretary of State at 4 p.m. |
2015-09-03 | Assembly | Senate amendments concurred in. To Engrossing and Enrolling. (Ayes 78. Noes 0. Page 2840.). |
2015-09-02 | Assembly | In Assembly. Concurrence in Senate amendments pending. |
2015-09-02 | Senate | Adopted and to Assembly. (Ayes 40. Noes 0. Page 2433.) |
2015-09-01 | Senate | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2015-08-31 | Senate | Read third time and amended. Ordered to second reading. |
2015-08-17 | Senate | From committee: Ordered to third reading. |
2015-07-16 | Senate | In Senate. To Com. on RLS. |
2015-07-16 | Assembly | Adopted and to Senate. (Ayes 79. Noes 0. Page 2430.) |
2015-07-09 | Assembly | From committee: Be adopted. To Consent Calendar. (Ayes 20. Noes 0.) (July 8). |
2015-04-27 | Assembly | Referred to Com. on G.O. |
2015-04-21 | Assembly | From printer. |
2015-04-20 | Assembly | Introduced. To print. |