CA ACR76 | 2011-2012 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on September 28 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-09-28 - Chaptered by Secretary of State - Res. Chapter 114, Statutes of 2011.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on September 28 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-09-28 - Chaptered by Secretary of State - Res. Chapter 114, Statutes of 2011.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Relative to the CHP Officer Thomas R. Adams Memorial Highway and the CHP Officer Paul C. Jarske Memorial Highway.
Title
CHP Officer Thomas R. Adams Memorial Highway and the CHP
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2011-09-08 - Senate - W/O REF. TO FILE ACR76 Chesbro (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-09-06 - Assembly - ACR 76 CHESBRO Assembly Third Reading (Y: 75 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2011-09-02 - Assembly - From committee: Be adopted. To third reading (Y: 10 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2011-09-01 - Assembly - Be adopted and be re-referred to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 11 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2011-09-06 - Assembly - ACR 76 CHESBRO Assembly Third Reading (Y: 75 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2011-09-02 - Assembly - From committee: Be adopted. To third reading (Y: 10 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2011-09-01 - Assembly - Be adopted and be re-referred to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 11 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2011-09-28 | Chaptered by Secretary of State - Res. Chapter 114, Statutes of 2011. | |
2011-09-28 | Enrolled and filed with the Secretary of State at 3:30 p.m. | |
2011-09-09 | In Assembly. Ordered to Engrossing and Enrolling. | |
2011-09-08 | Withdrawn from committee. Ordered to special consent calendar. Adopted and to Assembly. (Ayes 40. Noes 0. Page 2428.) | |
2011-09-07 | In Senate. To Com. on RLS. | |
2011-09-06 | Adopted and to Senate. (Ayes 75. Noes 0. Page 2929.) | |
2011-09-02 | From committee: Be adopted. Ordered to third reading. (Ayes 10. Noes 1.) (September 2). | |
2011-09-01 | From committee: Be adopted, and re-refer to Com. on APPR. Re-referred. (Ayes 11. Noes 1.) (September 1). Re-referred to Com. on APPR. | |
2011-08-29 | Re-referred to Com. on TRANS. | |
2011-08-26 | From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on TRANS. Amended. | |
2011-07-14 | Referred to Com. on TRANS. | |
2011-07-12 | From printer. | |
2011-07-11 | Introduced. To print. |