CA ACR89 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 59-12-1)
Status: Passed on August 22 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-08-22 - Chaptered by Secretary of State - Res. Chapter 130, Statutes of 2019.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 59-12-1)
Status: Passed on August 22 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-08-22 - Chaptered by Secretary of State - Res. Chapter 130, Statutes of 2019.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Relative to Special Districts Week.
Title
Special Districts Week.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-08-15 - Senate - Assembly 3rd Reading ACR89 Cooley et al. By Nielsen (Y: 36 N: 1 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-06-20 - Assembly - ACR 89 Cooley Consent Calendar Second Day (Y: 77 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-06-13 - Assembly - Be adopted. To Consent Calendar (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-06-20 - Assembly - ACR 89 Cooley Consent Calendar Second Day (Y: 77 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-06-13 - Assembly - Be adopted. To Consent Calendar (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-08-22 | Assembly | Chaptered by Secretary of State - Res. Chapter 130, Statutes of 2019. |
2019-08-22 | Assembly | Enrolled and filed with the Secretary of State at 3 p.m. |
2019-08-15 | Assembly | In Assembly. Ordered to Engrossing and Enrolling. |
2019-08-15 | Senate | Adopted and to Assembly. (Ayes 36. Noes 1. Page 2180.) |
2019-07-03 | Senate | From committee: Ordered to third reading. |
2019-06-24 | Senate | In Senate. To Com. on RLS. |
2019-06-20 | Assembly | Adopted and to Senate. (Ayes 77. Noes 0. Page 2371.) |
2019-06-20 | Assembly | Coauthors revised. |
2019-06-13 | Assembly | From committee: Be adopted. To Consent Calendar. (Ayes 11. Noes 0.) (June 13). |
2019-05-16 | Assembly | Referred to Com. on RLS. |
2019-05-07 | Assembly | From printer. |
2019-05-06 | Assembly | Introduced. To print. |