CA ACR94 | 2017-2018 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 49-21-1)
Status: Passed on September 12 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-09-12 - Chaptered by Secretary of State - Res. Chapter 148, Statutes of 2017.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 49-21-1)
Status: Passed on September 12 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-09-12 - Chaptered by Secretary of State - Res. Chapter 148, Statutes of 2017.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Relative to Alzheimer’s and Brain Awareness Month and The Longest Day.
Title
Alzheimer’s and Brain Awareness Month and The Longest Day.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2017-09-05 - Senate - Assembly 3rd Reading ACR94 Cooley et al. By McGuire (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-06-08 - Assembly - Be adopted. To third reading (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-06-08 - Assembly - Be adopted. To third reading (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-09-12 | Assembly | Chaptered by Secretary of State - Res. Chapter 148, Statutes of 2017. |
2017-09-12 | Assembly | Enrolled and filed with the Secretary of State at 10 a.m. |
2017-09-05 | Assembly | In Assembly. Ordered to Engrossing and Enrolling. |
2017-09-05 | Senate | Adopted and to Assembly. (Ayes 40. Noes 0. Page 2463.) |
2017-06-28 | Senate | From committee: Ordered to third reading. |
2017-06-20 | Senate | Measure version as revised on June 19 corrected. |
2017-06-20 | Senate | In Senate. To Com. on RLS. |
2017-06-19 | Assembly | Adopted and to Senate. (Page 2257.) |
2017-06-19 | Assembly | Coauthors revised. |
2017-06-08 | Assembly | From committee: Be adopted. Ordered to Third Reading. (Ayes 6. Noes 0.) (June 8). |
2017-05-22 | Assembly | Referred to Com. on RLS. |
2017-05-19 | Assembly | From printer. |
2017-05-18 | Assembly | Introduced. To print. |