CA ACR96 | 2009-2010 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 48-26)
Status: Passed on February 11 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-02-11 - Chaptered by Secretary of State - Res. Chapter 1, Statutes of 2010.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 48-26)
Status: Passed on February 11 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-02-11 - Chaptered by Secretary of State - Res. Chapter 1, Statutes of 2010.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Relative to Korean-American Day.
Title
Korean-American Day.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2010-02-04 - Senate - ASSEMBLY 3RD READING ACR96 HAYASHI BY YEE (Y: 32 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2010-01-07 - Assembly - From committee: Be adopted. To third reading (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2010-01-07 - Assembly - From committee: Be adopted. To third reading (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-02-11 | Chaptered by Secretary of State - Res. Chapter 1, Statutes of 2010. | |
2010-02-11 | Enrolled and filed with the Secretary of State at 2:30 p.m. | |
2010-02-08 | Senate amendments concurred in. To enrollment. (Page 3990.) | |
2010-02-04 | In Assembly. Concurrence in Senate amendments pending. | |
2010-02-04 | Adopted and to Assembly. (Ayes 32. Noes 0. Page 2763.) | |
2010-02-03 | Withdrawn from committee. Ordered to third reading. | |
2010-01-20 | From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to committee. Amended and re-referred to Com. on RLS. | |
2010-01-12 | In Senate. To Com. on RLS. | |
2010-01-11 | Amended, adopted, and to Senate. (Page 3747.) | |
2010-01-07 | From committee: Be adopted. To third reading. (Ayes 10. Noes 0.) (January 7). | |
2010-01-04 | Referred to Com. on RULES. | |
2009-09-11 | From printer. | |
2009-09-10 | Introduced. To print. |