CA AJR13 | 2023-2024 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 53-10)
Status: Passed on July 18 2024 - 100% progression
Action: 2024-07-18 - Chaptered by Secretary of State - Res. Chapter 158, Statutes of 2024.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 53-10)
Status: Passed on July 18 2024 - 100% progression
Action: 2024-07-18 - Chaptered by Secretary of State - Res. Chapter 158, Statutes of 2024.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Relative to postsecondary education.
Title
Tuition assistance programs.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2024-07-03 - Senate - Consent Calendar 2nd AJR13 Santiago et al (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2024-06-26 - Senate - Be adopted and be ordered to the Consent Calendar (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-05-28 - Assembly - AJR 13 Santiago Assembly Third Reading (Y: 68 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 11) [PASS]
2024-04-23 - Assembly - Be adopted. To third reading (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2024-06-26 - Senate - Be adopted and be ordered to the Consent Calendar (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-05-28 - Assembly - AJR 13 Santiago Assembly Third Reading (Y: 68 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 11) [PASS]
2024-04-23 - Assembly - Be adopted. To third reading (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-07-18 | Chaptered by Secretary of State - Res. Chapter 158, Statutes of 2024. | |
2024-07-18 | Enrolled and filed with the Secretary of State at 3 p.m. | |
2024-07-05 | Assembly | In Assembly. Ordered to Engrossing and Enrolling. |
2024-07-03 | Senate | Adopted and to Assembly. (Ayes 39. Noes 0. Page 4931.) |
2024-06-27 | Senate | Read second time. Ordered to Consent Calendar. |
2024-06-26 | Senate | From committee: Be adopted. To Consent Calendar. (Ayes 7. Noes 0.) (June 26). |
2024-06-05 | Senate | Referred to Com. on ED. |
2024-05-29 | Senate | In Senate. To Com. on RLS. |
2024-05-28 | Assembly | Adopted and to Senate. (Ayes 68. Noes 0.) |
2024-05-28 | Assembly | Coauthors revised. |
2024-04-24 | Assembly | From committee: Be adopted. Ordered to Third Reading. (Ayes 10. Noes 0.) (April 23). |
2024-04-08 | Assembly | Referred to Com. on HIGHER ED. |
2024-03-22 | Assembly | From printer. |
2024-03-21 | Assembly | Introduced. To print. |