CA AJR16 | 2009-2010 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Passed on July 6 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-07-06 - Chaptered by Secretary of State - Res. Chapter 50, Statutes of 2010.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Passed on July 6 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-07-06 - Chaptered by Secretary of State - Res. Chapter 50, Statutes of 2010.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Relative to journalism shield laws.
Title
Journalism shield laws.
Sponsors
Sen. Noreen Evans [D] | Sen. Mark Leno [D] |
Roll Calls
2010-06-28 - Assembly - AJR 16 EVANS Concurrence in Senate Amendments (Y: 75 N: 1 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2010-06-24 - Senate - Consent Calendar 2nd AJR16 Evans (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 8 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2010-06-15 - Senate - Be adopted and be placed on the Consent Calendar (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2009-07-06 - Assembly - AJR 16 EVANS Consent Calendar Second Day (Y: 78 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2009-06-23 - Assembly - Be adopted, as amended, to Consent Calendar. (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2010-06-24 - Senate - Consent Calendar 2nd AJR16 Evans (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 8 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2010-06-15 - Senate - Be adopted and be placed on the Consent Calendar (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2009-07-06 - Assembly - AJR 16 EVANS Consent Calendar Second Day (Y: 78 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2009-06-23 - Assembly - Be adopted, as amended, to Consent Calendar. (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-07-06 | Chaptered by Secretary of State - Res. Chapter 50, Statutes of 2010. | |
2010-07-06 | Enrolled and filed with the Secretary of State at 11:30 a.m. | |
2010-06-28 | Senate amendments concurred in. To enrollment. (Ayes 75. Noes 1. Page 5837.) | |
2010-06-24 | In Assembly. Concurrence in Senate amendments pending. | |
2010-06-24 | Adopted and to Assembly. (Ayes 31. Noes 0. Page 4057.) | |
2010-06-17 | Read second time. To Consent Calendar. | |
2010-06-16 | From committee: Be adopted. To Consent Calendar. (June 15). | |
2010-06-03 | From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to committee. Amended and re-referred to Com. on JUD. | |
2010-05-20 | Re-referred to Com. on JUD. | |
2009-07-06 | In Senate. To Com. on RLS. | |
2009-07-06 | Adopted and to Senate. (Ayes 78. Noes 0. Page 2390.) | |
2009-07-01 | Amended. To Consent Calendar. | |
2009-06-30 | From committee: Amend, and be adopted as amended. To Consent Calendar. (June 23). | |
2009-05-11 | Referred to Com. on JUD. | |
2009-05-01 | From printer. | |
2009-04-30 | Introduced. To print. |