CA AJR19 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 59-1-1)
Status: Passed on September 26 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-09-26 - Chaptered by Secretary of State - Res. Chapter 183, Statutes of 2019.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 59-1-1)
Status: Passed on September 26 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-09-26 - Chaptered by Secretary of State - Res. Chapter 183, Statutes of 2019.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Relative to refugees.
Title
Refugees.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-09-09 - Assembly - AJR 19 Gloria Concurrence in Senate Amendments (Y: 63 N: 0 NV: 16 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-09-04 - Senate - Assembly 3rd Reading AJR19 Gloria et al. By Pan (Y: 30 N: 0 NV: 10 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-08-27 - Senate - Be adopted as amended (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-06-27 - Assembly - AJR 19 Gloria Assembly Third Reading (Y: 57 N: 0 NV: 22 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-06-18 - Assembly - Be adopted. To third reading (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-09-04 - Senate - Assembly 3rd Reading AJR19 Gloria et al. By Pan (Y: 30 N: 0 NV: 10 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-08-27 - Senate - Be adopted as amended (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-06-27 - Assembly - AJR 19 Gloria Assembly Third Reading (Y: 57 N: 0 NV: 22 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-06-18 - Assembly - Be adopted. To third reading (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-09-26 | Assembly | Chaptered by Secretary of State - Res. Chapter 183, Statutes of 2019. |
2019-09-26 | Assembly | Enrolled and filed with the Secretary of State at 3 p.m. |
2019-09-09 | Assembly | Senate amendments concurred in. To Engrossing and Enrolling. (Ayes 63. Noes 0. Page 3135.). |
2019-09-05 | Assembly | In Assembly. Concurrence in Senate amendments pending. |
2019-09-04 | Senate | Adopted and to Assembly. (Ayes 30. Noes 0. Page 2514.) |
2019-08-28 | Senate | Amended. Ordered to third reading. |
2019-08-27 | Senate | From committee: Amend, and be adopted as amended. (Ayes 8. Noes 0.) (August 27). |
2019-07-10 | Senate | Re-referred to Com. on JUD. |
2019-07-01 | Senate | In Senate. To Com. on RLS. |
2019-06-27 | Assembly | Adopted and to Senate. (Ayes 57. Noes 0. Page 2455.) |
2019-06-27 | Assembly | Coauthors revised. |
2019-06-18 | Assembly | From committee: Be adopted. Ordered to Third Reading. (Ayes 9. Noes 0.) (June 18). |
2019-06-18 | Assembly | Coauthors revised. |
2019-06-06 | Assembly | Referred to Com. on JUD. |
2019-05-22 | Assembly | From printer. |
2019-05-21 | Assembly | Introduced. To print. |