CA AJR4 | 2017-2018 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 52-8)
Status: Passed on September 21 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-09-21 - Chaptered by Secretary of State - Res. Chapter 172, Statutes of 2017.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 52-8)
Status: Passed on September 21 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-09-21 - Chaptered by Secretary of State - Res. Chapter 172, Statutes of 2017.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Relative to home ownership.
Title
Home Ownership.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2017-09-12 - Senate - Assembly 3rd Reading AJR4 Cervantes et al. By Newman (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-06-20 - Senate - Be adopted. Ordered to third reading (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-05-04 - Assembly - AJR 4 CERVANTES Assembly Third Reading (Y: 67 N: 0 NV: 13 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-03-08 - Assembly - Be adopted. To third reading (Y: 5 N: 1 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-06-20 - Senate - Be adopted. Ordered to third reading (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-05-04 - Assembly - AJR 4 CERVANTES Assembly Third Reading (Y: 67 N: 0 NV: 13 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-03-08 - Assembly - Be adopted. To third reading (Y: 5 N: 1 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-09-21 | Assembly | Chaptered by Secretary of State - Res. Chapter 172, Statutes of 2017. |
2017-09-21 | Assembly | Enrolled and filed with the Secretary of State at 11 a.m. |
2017-09-13 | Assembly | In Assembly. Ordered to Engrossing and Enrolling. |
2017-09-12 | Senate | Adopted and to Assembly. (Ayes 39. Noes 0. Page 2758.) |
2017-06-21 | Senate | From committee: Be adopted. Ordered to Third Reading. (Ayes 11. Noes 0.) (June 20). |
2017-05-18 | Senate | Re-referred to Com. on T. & H. |
2017-05-08 | Senate | In Senate. To Com. on RLS. |
2017-05-04 | Assembly | Adopted and to Senate. (Ayes 67. Noes 0. Page 1372.) |
2017-05-04 | Assembly | Coauthors revised. |
2017-03-08 | Assembly | From committee: Be adopted. Ordered to Third Reading. (Ayes 6. Noes 1.) (March 8). |
2017-02-21 | Assembly | Referred to Com. on H. & C.D. |
2017-02-14 | Assembly | From printer. |
2017-02-13 | Assembly | Introduced. To print. |