CA AR113 | 2017-2018 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 55-21-1)
Status: Passed on August 23 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-08-23 - Read. Adopted. (Page 6503.).
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 55-21-1)
Status: Passed on August 23 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-08-23 - Read. Adopted. (Page 6503.).
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Relative to Piqui’s Resolution.
Title
Relative to Piqui’s Resolution.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2018-08-14 - Assembly - Be adopted. To third reading (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-08-23 | Assembly | Read. Adopted. (Page 6503.). |
2018-08-23 | Assembly | Coauthors revised. |
2018-08-14 | Assembly | From committee: Be adopted. Ordered to Third Reading. (Ayes 8. Noes 0.) (August 14). |
2018-08-07 | Assembly | Re-referred to Com. on JUD. |
2018-08-06 | Assembly | From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on JUD. Amended. |
2018-06-18 | Assembly | Referred to Com. on JUD. |
2018-06-13 | Assembly | Introduced. |