CA AR34 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on June 6 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-06-06 - Read. Adopted. (Ayes 77. Noes 0. Page 2221.).
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on June 6 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-06-06 - Read. Adopted. (Ayes 77. Noes 0. Page 2221.).
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Relative to Loving Day.
Title
Relative to Loving Day.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-06-06 - Assembly - HR 34 McCarty Consent Calendar Second Day (Y: 77 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-06-04 - Assembly - Be adopted. To Consent Calendar (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-06-04 - Assembly - Be adopted. To Consent Calendar (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-06-06 | Assembly | Read. Adopted. (Ayes 77. Noes 0. Page 2221.). |
2019-06-04 | Assembly | From committee: Be adopted. To Consent Calendar. (Ayes 11. Noes 0.) (June 4). |
2019-05-09 | Assembly | Referred to Com. on JUD. |
2019-05-02 | Assembly | Introduced. |