CA AR36 | 2013-2014 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 53-20)
Status: Introduced on March 27 2014 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2014-07-03 - Read. Amended. Adopted. (Page 5794.).
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on March 27 2014 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2014-07-03 - Read. Amended. Adopted. (Page 5794.).
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Relative to the 4th of July.
Title
Relative to the 4th of July.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2014-06-30 - Assembly - From committee: Be adopted. To third reading (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-07-03 | Assembly | Read. Amended. Adopted. (Page 5794.). |
2014-06-30 | Assembly | From committee: Be adopted. Ordered to third reading. (Ayes 11. Noes 0.) (June 30). |
2014-05-08 | Assembly | Referred to Com. on RLS. |
2014-03-27 | Assembly | Introduced. |