CA AR42 | 2021-2022 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 60-17-1)
Status: Passed on May 24 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-05-24 - Read. Adopted. (Page 1535.).
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 60-17-1)
Status: Passed on May 24 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-05-24 - Read. Adopted. (Page 1535.).
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Relative to Asian and Pacific Islander American Heritage Month.
Title
Relative to Asian and Pacific Islander American Heritage Month.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2021-05-20 - Assembly - Be adopted. To third reading (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-05-24 | Assembly | Read. Adopted. (Page 1535.). |
2021-05-24 | Assembly | Coauthors revised. |
2021-05-20 | Assembly | From committee: Be adopted. Ordered to Third Reading. (Ayes 11. Noes 0.) (May 20). |
2021-05-06 | Assembly | Referred to Com. on RLS. |
2021-04-29 | Assembly | Introduced. |