CA AR44 | 2021-2022 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 55-17-1)
Status: Passed on June 17 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-06-17 - Read. Adopted. (Ayes 72. Noes 0. Page 2016.).
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 55-17-1)
Status: Passed on June 17 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-06-17 - Read. Adopted. (Ayes 72. Noes 0. Page 2016.).
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Relative to state scientists.
Title
Relative to state scientists.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2021-06-17 - Assembly - HR 44 Quirk Consent Calendar Second Day Regular Session (Y: 72 N: 0 NV: 7 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-06-10 - Assembly - Be adopted. To Consent Calendar (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-06-10 - Assembly - Be adopted. To Consent Calendar (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-06-17 | Assembly | Read. Adopted. (Ayes 72. Noes 0. Page 2016.). |
2021-06-17 | Assembly | Coauthors revised. |
2021-06-10 | Assembly | From committee: Be adopted. To Consent Calendar. (Ayes 12. Noes 0.) (June 10). |
2021-05-20 | Assembly | Referred to Com. on RLS. |
2021-05-12 | Assembly | Introduced. |