CA SB1 | 2021-2022 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 8-0)
Status: Passed on September 23 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-09-23 - Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 236, Statutes of 2021.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 8-0)
Status: Passed on September 23 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-09-23 - Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 236, Statutes of 2021.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
An act to amend Sections 30001.5, 30501, and 71116 of, to add Section 30421 to, to add Article 8 (commencing with Section 30270) to Chapter 3 of Division 20 of, and to add Division 20.6.5 (commencing with Section 30970) to, the Public Resources Code, relating to coastal resources.
Title
Coastal resources: sea level rise.
Sponsors
Sen. Toni Atkins [D] | Asm. Cottie Petrie-Norris [D] | Sen. Henry Stern [D] | Sen. Bob Hertzberg [D] |
Sen. Benjamin Hueso [D] | Sen. John Laird [D] | Sen. Monique Limon [D] | Sen. Anthony Portantino [D] |
Roll Calls
2021-09-02 - Senate - Unfinished Business SB1 Atkins et al. Concurrence (Y: 33 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2021-09-01 - Assembly - SB 1 Atkins Senate Third Reading By Petrie-Norris (Y: 60 N: 12 NV: 0 Abs: 7) [PASS]
2021-08-26 - Assembly - Do pass (Y: 13 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-06-23 - Assembly - Do pass as amended and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-05-24 - Senate - Senate 3rd Reading SB1 Atkins et al (Y: 33 N: 5 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-05-20 - Senate - Do pass (Y: 6 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-04-19 - Senate - Placed on suspense file (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-04-12 - Senate - Do pass, but first be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 5 N: 1 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-03-16 - Senate - Do pass as amended, but first amend, and re-refer to the Committee on [Environmental Quality] (Y: 7 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-09-01 - Assembly - SB 1 Atkins Senate Third Reading By Petrie-Norris (Y: 60 N: 12 NV: 0 Abs: 7) [PASS]
2021-08-26 - Assembly - Do pass (Y: 13 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-06-23 - Assembly - Do pass as amended and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-05-24 - Senate - Senate 3rd Reading SB1 Atkins et al (Y: 33 N: 5 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-05-20 - Senate - Do pass (Y: 6 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-04-19 - Senate - Placed on suspense file (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-04-12 - Senate - Do pass, but first be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 5 N: 1 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-03-16 - Senate - Do pass as amended, but first amend, and re-refer to the Committee on [Environmental Quality] (Y: 7 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-09-23 | Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 236, Statutes of 2021. | |
2021-09-23 | Approved by the Governor. | |
2021-09-09 | Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 1 p.m. | |
2021-09-02 | Senate | Assembly amendments concurred in. (Ayes 33. Noes 2. Page 2349.) Ordered to engrossing and enrolling. |
2021-09-01 | Senate | In Senate. Concurrence in Assembly amendments pending. |
2021-09-01 | Assembly | Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 60. Noes 12. Page 2598.) Ordered to the Senate. |
2021-08-30 | Assembly | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2021-08-26 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 13. Noes 3.) (August 26). |
2021-07-14 | Assembly | July 14 set for first hearing. Placed on suspense file. |
2021-06-24 | Assembly | Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2021-06-23 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 9. Noes 0.) (June 23). |
2021-05-28 | Assembly | Referred to Com. on NAT. RES. |
2021-05-24 | Assembly | In Assembly. Read first time. Held at Desk. |
2021-05-24 | Senate | Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 33. Noes 5. Page 1235.) Ordered to the Assembly. |
2021-05-20 | Senate | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2021-05-20 | Senate | From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 6. Noes 1. Page 1178.) (May 20). |
2021-05-14 | Senate | Set for hearing May 20. |
2021-04-20 | Senate | April 19 hearing: Placed on APPR suspense file. |
2021-04-14 | Senate | Set for hearing April 19. |
2021-04-12 | Senate | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 5. Noes 1. Page 756.) (April 12). Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2021-04-06 | Senate | Set for hearing April 12. |
2021-03-23 | Senate | Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on E.Q. |
2021-03-22 | Senate | From committee: Do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on E.Q. (Ayes 7. Noes 2. Page 518.) (March 16). |
2021-02-17 | Senate | Set for hearing March 16. |
2021-01-28 | Senate | Referral to Com. on G.O. rescinded because of the limitations placed on committee hearings due to ongoing health and safety risks of the COVID-19 virus. |
2021-01-28 | Senate | Referred to Coms. on N.R. & W., EQ., and G.O. |
2020-12-08 | Senate | From printer. May be acted upon on or after January 7. |
2020-12-07 | Senate | Introduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print. |
Code Citations
Chapter | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|
Public Resources Code | 30001.5 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Public Resources Code | 30421 | New Code | See Bill Text |
Public Resources Code | 30501 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Public Resources Code | 71116 | Amended Code | Citation Text |