CA SB1021 | 2011-2012 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Unknown
Status: Passed on June 27 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-06-27 - Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 41, Statutes of 2012.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Spectrum: Unknown
Status: Passed on June 27 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-06-27 - Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 41, Statutes of 2012.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
An act to amend Sections 631 and 631.3 of, and to amend and repeal Section 367.6 of, the Code of Civil Procedure, to amend Section 53086 of the Education Code, to amend Sections 11552, 12838, 12838.1, 21221, 21224, 21229, 68085.1, 68086, 68090.8, 68106, 68502.5, 68926, 68927, 69921, 69922, 69925, 69950, 70371.5, 70602.5, 70617, 70626, 76000.3, 77003, 77202, 77204, 77205, and 77209 of, to amend and repeal Section 72011 of, to amend, repeal, and add Sections 68085, 70616, 70657, and 70677 of, to add Sections 11011.28 and 69923 to, to add and repeal Sections 12838.14 and 70602.6 of, to repeal Sections 12838.2, 12838.3, 69927, and 77213 of, and to repeal and add Sections 69920, 69921.5, 69926, and 77203 of, the Government Code, to amend Sections 1170.05, 1231, 1233.1, 1233.6, 1233.61, 2065, 3417, 5024.2, 5072, 5075.1, 6024, 6027, 6030, 6126, and 13800 of, to amend and repeal Section 1465.8 of, to amend, repeal, and add Section 4115.5 of, to add Sections 5031, 5032, 13155, and 13827 to, and to add Article 5 (commencing with Section 2985) to Chapter 7 of Title 7 of Part 3 of, the Penal Code, to amend Section 8200 of the Probate Code, and to amend Sections 607, 736, 912, 1016, 1703, 1711, 1713, 1719, 1719.5, 1725, 1731.5, 1752.16, 1752.81, 1764.2, 1766, 1766.01, 1767.3, 1767.35, 1767.36, 1769, 1771, 1800, 1800.5, 1916, 3050, 3051, 3100, 3100.6, and 3201 of, to add Section 3202 to, and to repeal Chapter 1 (commencing with Section 3000) of Division 3 of, the Welfare and Institutions Code, relating to public safety, and making an appropriation therefor, to take effect immediately, bill related to the budget.
Title
Public safety.
Sponsors
No sponsor information available at this time. |
Roll Calls
2012-06-27 - Assembly - SB 1021 B.& F. R. Senate Third Reading By BLUMENFIELD (Y: 50 N: 27 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2012-06-27 - Senate - Unfinished Supp 1 SB1021 Committee on B. & F.R. (Leno) Concurrence (Y: 24 N: 15 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-03-22 - Senate - Senate 3rd Reading SB1021 Committee on B. & F.R. (Leno) (Y: 23 N: 10 NV: 7 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-06-27 - Senate - Unfinished Supp 1 SB1021 Committee on B. & F.R. (Leno) Concurrence (Y: 24 N: 15 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-03-22 - Senate - Senate 3rd Reading SB1021 Committee on B. & F.R. (Leno) (Y: 23 N: 10 NV: 7 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2012-06-27 | Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 41, Statutes of 2012. | |
2012-06-27 | Approved by the Governor. | |
2012-06-27 | Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 6 p.m. | |
2012-06-27 | In Senate. Concurrence in Assembly amendments pending. Assembly amendments concurred in. (Ayes 24. Noes 15. Page 4150.) Ordered to engrossing and enrolling. | |
2012-06-27 | Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 50. Noes 27. Page 5476.) Ordered to the Senate. | |
2012-06-25 | From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on BUDGET. Assembly Rule 96 suspended. (Page 5412.) Withdrawn from committee. Ordered to third reading. | |
2012-03-26 | Referred to Com. on BUDGET. | |
2012-03-22 | In Assembly. Read first time. Held at Desk. | |
2012-03-22 | Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 23. Noes 10. Page 2979.) Ordered to the Assembly. | |
2012-03-12 | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. | |
2012-03-08 | Withdrawn from committee. (Ayes 24. Noes 14. Page 2916.) Ordered to second reading. | |
2012-02-16 | Referred to Com. on RLS. | |
2012-02-07 | From printer. May be acted upon on or after March 8. | |
2012-02-06 | Introduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print. |