CA SB1021 | 2021-2022 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on May 24 2022 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-06-28 - June 28 hearing postponed by committee.
Pending: Assembly Public Safety Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on May 24 2022 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-06-28 - June 28 hearing postponed by committee.
Pending: Assembly Public Safety Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
An act to amend Section 1001.95 of the Penal Code, and to amend Sections 13386 and 23575.3 of the Vehicle Code, relating to vehicles.
Title
Vehicles: driving under the influence of alcohol or drugs.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2022-05-24 - Senate - Senate 3rd Reading SB1021 Bradford (Y: 22 N: 10 NV: 0 Abs: 8) [PASS]
2022-05-19 - Senate - Do pass (Y: 5 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-05-02 - Senate - Placed on suspense file (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-04-19 - Senate - Do pass, but first be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 4 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2022-05-19 - Senate - Do pass (Y: 5 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-05-02 - Senate - Placed on suspense file (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-04-19 - Senate - Do pass, but first be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 4 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-06-28 | Assembly | June 28 hearing postponed by committee. |
2022-06-21 | Assembly | June 21 hearing postponed by committee. |
2022-06-14 | Assembly | June 14 set for second hearing canceled at the request of author. |
2022-06-09 | Assembly | From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on PUB. S. |
2022-06-08 | Assembly | June 8 set for first hearing canceled at the request of author. |
2022-05-27 | Assembly | Referred to Com. on PUB. S. |
2022-05-25 | Assembly | In Assembly. Read first time. Held at Desk. |
2022-05-24 | Senate | Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 22. Noes 10. Page 3869.) Ordered to the Assembly. |
2022-05-19 | Senate | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2022-05-19 | Senate | From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 5. Noes 2. Page 3780.) (May 19). |
2022-05-13 | Senate | Set for hearing May 19. |
2022-05-02 | Senate | May 2 hearing: Placed on APPR suspense file. |
2022-04-22 | Senate | Set for hearing May 2. |
2022-04-19 | Senate | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 4. Noes 0. Page 3440.) (April 19). Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2022-03-24 | Senate | Set for hearing April 19. |
2022-03-23 | Senate | Re-referred to Com. on PUB. S. |
2022-03-16 | Senate | From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on RLS. |
2022-02-23 | Senate | Referred to Com. on RLS. |
2022-02-15 | Senate | From printer. |
2022-02-14 | Senate | Article IV Section 8(a) of the Constitution and Joint Rule 55 dispensed with February 7, 2022, suspending the 30 calendar day requirement. |
2022-02-14 | Senate | Introduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print. |
Code Citations
Chapter | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|
Penal Code | 1001.95 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Vehicle Code | 13386 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Vehicle Code | 23575.3 | Amended Code | Citation Text |