CA SB1027 | 2023-2024 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on April 18 2024 - 50% progression
Action: 2024-07-03 - Read second time. Ordered to consent calendar.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on April 18 2024 - 50% progression
Action: 2024-07-03 - Read second time. Ordered to consent calendar.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
An act to amend Sections 84101 and 84615 of the Government Code, relating to the Political Reform Act of 1974.
Title
Political Reform Act of 1974: disclosures.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2024-07-02 - Assembly - Do pass. To Consent Calendar (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-06-18 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] with recommendation: To Consent Calendar (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-06-12 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on [Judiciary] with recommendation: To Consent Calendar (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-04-18 - Senate - Consent Calendar 2nd SB1027 Menjivar (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2024-04-02 - Senate - Do pass, but first be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] with the recommendation: To Consent Calendar (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-03-19 - Senate - Do pass as amended, but first amend, and re-refer to the Committee on [Judiciary] (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-06-18 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] with recommendation: To Consent Calendar (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-06-12 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on [Judiciary] with recommendation: To Consent Calendar (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-04-18 - Senate - Consent Calendar 2nd SB1027 Menjivar (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2024-04-02 - Senate - Do pass, but first be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] with the recommendation: To Consent Calendar (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-03-19 - Senate - Do pass as amended, but first amend, and re-refer to the Committee on [Judiciary] (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-07-03 | Assembly | Read second time. Ordered to consent calendar. |
2024-07-02 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass. Ordered to consent calendar. (Ayes 15. Noes 0.) (July 2). |
2024-06-18 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. with recommendation: To consent calendar. (Ayes 12. Noes 0.) (June 18). Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2024-06-12 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on JUD. with recommendation: To consent calendar. (Ayes 8. Noes 0.) (June 12). Re-referred to Com. on JUD. |
2024-05-13 | Assembly | Referred to Coms. on ELECTIONS and JUD. |
2024-04-18 | Assembly | In Assembly. Read first time. Held at Desk. |
2024-04-18 | Senate | Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 39. Noes 0. Page 3672.) Ordered to the Assembly. |
2024-04-16 | Senate | Read second time. Ordered to consent calendar. |
2024-04-15 | Senate | From committee: Be ordered to second reading pursuant to Senate Rule 28.8 and ordered to consent calendar. |
2024-04-05 | Senate | Set for hearing April 15. |
2024-04-03 | Senate | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR with recommendation: To consent calendar. (Ayes 11. Noes 0. Page 3447.) (April 2). Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2024-03-26 | Senate | Set for hearing April 2. |
2024-03-20 | Senate | Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on JUD. |
2024-03-19 | Senate | From committee: Do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on JUD. (Ayes 7. Noes 0. Page 3348.) (March 19). |
2024-03-12 | Senate | From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on E. & C.A. |
2024-03-08 | Senate | Set for hearing March 19. |
2024-02-14 | Senate | Referred to Coms. on E. & C.A. and JUD. |
2024-02-07 | Senate | From printer. May be acted upon on or after March 8. |
2024-02-06 | Senate | Introduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print. |
Code Citations
Chapter | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|
Government Code | 84101 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Government Code | 84615 | Amended Code | Citation Text |