CA SB1029 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Engrossed on June 11 2020 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-08-30 - Ordered to inactive file on request of Assembly Member Calderon.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on June 11 2020 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-08-30 - Ordered to inactive file on request of Assembly Member Calderon.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
An act to add Section 14087.385 to the Welfare and Institutions Code, relating to Medi-Cal.
Title
Medi-Cal: County of Sacramento.
Sponsors
Sen. Richard Pan [D] | Asm. Ken Cooley [D] | Asm. Jim Cooper [D] | Sen. Brian Dahle [R] |
Asm. Kevin Kiley [R] | Asm. Kevin McCarty [D] | Sen. Jim Nielsen [R] |
Roll Calls
2020-08-18 - Assembly - Do pass as amended (Y: 18 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-08-04 - Assembly - Do pass as amended and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 14 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-06-11 - Senate - Consent Calendar SB1029 (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-05-13 - Senate - Do pass as amended, and be ordered to the Consent Calendar (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-08-04 - Assembly - Do pass as amended and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 14 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-06-11 - Senate - Consent Calendar SB1029 (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-05-13 - Senate - Do pass as amended, and be ordered to the Consent Calendar (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-08-30 | Assembly | Ordered to inactive file on request of Assembly Member Calderon. |
2020-08-25 | Assembly | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2020-08-24 | Assembly | Read second time and amended. Ordered to second reading. |
2020-08-20 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass as amended. (Ayes 18. Noes 0.) (August 18). |
2020-08-06 | Assembly | Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2020-08-05 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 14. Noes 0.) (August 4). |
2020-07-27 | Assembly | From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on HEALTH. |
2020-06-18 | Assembly | Referred to Com. on HEALTH. |
2020-06-11 | Assembly | In Assembly. Read first time. Held at Desk. |
2020-06-11 | Senate | Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 39. Noes 0. Page 3680.) Ordered to the Assembly. |
2020-05-14 | Senate | Read second time and amended. Ordered to consent calendar. |
2020-05-13 | Senate | From committee: Do pass as amended. Ordered to consent calendar. (Ayes 9. Noes 0. Page 3533.) (May 13). |
2020-05-11 | Senate | Set for hearing May 13. |
2020-04-29 | Senate | From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on HEALTH. |
2020-03-19 | Senate | From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on HEALTH. |
2020-02-27 | Senate | Referred to Com. on HEALTH. |
2020-02-18 | Senate | From printer. May be acted upon on or after March 19. |
2020-02-14 | Senate | Introduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print. |
Code Citations
Chapter | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|
Welfare and Institutions Code | 14087.385 | New Code | See Bill Text |