CA SB1033 | 2011-2012 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Unknown
Status: Passed on June 27 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-06-27 - Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 44, Statutes of 2012.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Spectrum: Unknown
Status: Passed on June 27 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-06-27 - Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 44, Statutes of 2012.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
An act to add Section 16340 to the Government Code, relating to state and local government, and making an appropriation therefor, to take effect immediately, bill related to the budget.
Title
State and local government.
Sponsors
No sponsor information available at this time. |
Roll Calls
2012-06-27 - Assembly - SB 1033 B.& F. R. Senate Third Reading By BLUMENFIELD (Y: 51 N: 27 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2012-06-27 - Senate - Unfinished Supp 1 SB1033 Committee on B. & F.R. (Leno) Concurrence (Y: 25 N: 14 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-03-22 - Senate - Senate 3rd Reading SB1033 Committee on B. & F.R. (Leno) (Y: 23 N: 10 NV: 7 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-06-27 - Senate - Unfinished Supp 1 SB1033 Committee on B. & F.R. (Leno) Concurrence (Y: 25 N: 14 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-03-22 - Senate - Senate 3rd Reading SB1033 Committee on B. & F.R. (Leno) (Y: 23 N: 10 NV: 7 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2012-06-27 | Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 44, Statutes of 2012. | |
2012-06-27 | Approved by the Governor. | |
2012-06-27 | Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 6 p.m. | |
2012-06-27 | In Senate. Concurrence in Assembly amendments pending. Assembly amendments concurred in. (Ayes 25. Noes 14. Page 4146.) Ordered to engrossing and enrolling. | |
2012-06-27 | Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 51. Noes 27. Page 5470.) Ordered to the Senate. | |
2012-06-25 | From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on BUDGET. Assembly Rule 96 suspended. (Page 5412.) Withdrawn from committee. Ordered to third reading. | |
2012-03-26 | Referred to Com. on BUDGET. | |
2012-03-22 | In Assembly. Read first time. Held at Desk. | |
2012-03-22 | Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 23. Noes 10. Page 2983.) Ordered to the Assembly. | |
2012-03-12 | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. | |
2012-03-08 | Withdrawn from committee. (Ayes 24. Noes 14. Page 2916.) Ordered to second reading. | |
2012-02-16 | Referred to Com. on RLS. | |
2012-02-07 | From printer. May be acted upon on or after March 8. | |
2012-02-06 | Introduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print. |
Code Citations
Chapter | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|
Government Code | 16340 | New Code | See Bill Text |