CA SB1033 | 2013-2014 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on April 10 2014 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2014-08-29 - Ordered to inactive file on request of Assembly Member V. Manuel Pérez.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on April 10 2014 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2014-08-29 - Ordered to inactive file on request of Assembly Member V. Manuel Pérez.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
An act to amend Section 65583 of the Government Code, relating to local planning.
Title
Land use: local planning: housing elements.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2014-06-25 - Assembly - Do pass (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-06-18 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on Local Government (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2014-04-10 - Senate - Consent Calendar 2nd SB1033 Torres (Y: 34 N: 0 NV: 6 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-04-01 - Senate - Do pass and be placed on the Consent Calendar (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-06-18 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on Local Government (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2014-04-10 - Senate - Consent Calendar 2nd SB1033 Torres (Y: 34 N: 0 NV: 6 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-04-01 - Senate - Do pass and be placed on the Consent Calendar (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-08-29 | Assembly | Ordered to inactive file on request of Assembly Member V. Manuel Pérez. |
2014-06-30 | Assembly | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2014-06-26 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 9. Noes 0.) (June 25). |
2014-06-18 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on L. GOV. (Ayes 6. Noes 0.) (June 18). Re-referred to Com. on L. GOV. |
2014-06-12 | Assembly | Assembly Rule 56 (pending re-referral to L. Gov.) suspended. (Page 5488.) |
2014-06-02 | Assembly | Hearing postponed by committee. |
2014-05-08 | Assembly | Referred to Coms. on H. & C.D. and L. GOV. |
2014-04-10 | Assembly | In Assembly. Read first time. Held at Desk. |
2014-04-10 | Senate | Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 34. Noes 0. Page 3144.) Ordered to the Assembly. |
2014-04-03 | Senate | Read second time. Ordered to consent calendar. |
2014-04-02 | Senate | From committee: Do pass. Ordered to consent calendar. (Ayes 11. Noes 0. Page 3038.) (April 1). |
2014-03-13 | Senate | Set for hearing April 1. |
2014-02-27 | Senate | Referred to Com. on T. & H. |
2014-02-18 | Senate | From printer. May be acted upon on or after March 20. |
2014-02-14 | Senate | Introduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print. |
Code Citations
Chapter | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|
Government Code | 65583 | Amended Code | Citation Text |