CA SB1041 | 2023-2024 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on February 7 2024 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-05-16 - May 16 hearing: Held in committee and under submission.
Pending: Senate Appropriations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on February 7 2024 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-05-16 - May 16 hearing: Held in committee and under submission.
Pending: Senate Appropriations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
An act to add Article 7.6 (commencing with Section 3538) to Chapter 7.7 of Division 2 of the Business and Professions Code, relating to healing arts.
Title
Physician assistants: licensure: Armenian medical graduate physician assistants.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2024-04-29 - Senate - Placed on suspense file (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2024-04-15 - Senate - Do pass, but first be re-referred to the Committee on [Health] (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2024-04-15 - Senate - Do pass, but first be re-referred to the Committee on [Health] (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-05-16 | Senate | May 16 hearing: Held in committee and under submission. |
2024-05-10 | Senate | Set for hearing May 16. |
2024-04-29 | Senate | April 29 hearing: Placed on APPR suspense file. |
2024-04-22 | Senate | Set for hearing April 29. |
2024-04-16 | Senate | Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2024-04-16 | Senate | Withdrawn from committee. |
2024-04-16 | Senate | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on HEALTH. (Ayes 12. Noes 0. Page 3605.) (April 15). Re-referred to Com. on HEALTH. |
2024-04-08 | Senate | From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on B., P. & E. D. |
2024-04-05 | Senate | Set for hearing April 15. |
2024-02-14 | Senate | Referred to Coms. on B., P. & E. D. and HEALTH. |
2024-02-08 | Senate | From printer. May be acted upon on or after March 9. |
2024-02-07 | Senate | Introduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print. |
Code Citations
Chapter | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|
Business and Professions Code | 3538 | New Code | See Bill Text |