CA SB1051 | 2023-2024 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on July 2 2024 - 100% progression
Action: 2024-07-02 - Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 75, Statutes of 2024.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on July 2 2024 - 100% progression
Action: 2024-07-02 - Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 75, Statutes of 2024.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
An act to amend Section 1941.6 of, to add Section 1946.9 to, and to repeal and add Section 1941.5 of, the Civil Code, relating to tenancies.
Title
Victims of abuse or violence: lock changes.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2024-06-17 - Assembly - SB 1051 Eggman Consent Calendar Second Day (Y: 72 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 7) [PASS]
2024-06-11 - Assembly - Do pass. To Consent Calendar (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-05-20 - Senate - Senate 3rd Reading SB1051 Eggman (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2024-04-23 - Senate - Do pass, but first be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-06-11 - Assembly - Do pass. To Consent Calendar (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-05-20 - Senate - Senate 3rd Reading SB1051 Eggman (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2024-04-23 - Senate - Do pass, but first be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-07-02 | Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 75, Statutes of 2024. | |
2024-07-02 | Approved by the Governor. | |
2024-06-26 | Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 1:30 p.m. | |
2024-06-17 | Senate | In Senate. Ordered to engrossing and enrolling. |
2024-06-17 | Assembly | Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 72. Noes 0. Page 5887.) Ordered to the Senate. |
2024-06-12 | Assembly | Read second time. Ordered to consent calendar. |
2024-06-11 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass. Ordered to consent calendar. (Ayes 12. Noes 0.) (June 11). |
2024-05-28 | Assembly | Referred to Com. on JUD. |
2024-05-21 | Assembly | In Assembly. Read first time. Held at Desk. |
2024-05-20 | Senate | Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 38. Noes 0. Page 4022.) Ordered to the Assembly. |
2024-05-16 | Senate | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2024-05-15 | Senate | Ordered to second reading. |
2024-05-15 | Senate | Read third time and amended. |
2024-05-07 | Senate | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2024-05-06 | Senate | From committee: Be ordered to second reading pursuant to Senate Rule 28.8. |
2024-04-26 | Senate | Set for hearing May 6. |
2024-04-24 | Senate | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 11. Noes 0. Page 3725.) (April 23). Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2024-04-11 | Senate | From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on JUD. |
2024-04-04 | Senate | Set for hearing April 23. |
2024-04-03 | Senate | Re-referred to Coms. on JUD. and APPR. |
2024-03-20 | Senate | From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on RLS. |
2024-02-14 | Senate | Referred to Com. on RLS. |
2024-02-08 | Senate | From printer. May be acted upon on or after March 9. |
2024-02-07 | Senate | Introduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print. |
Code Citations
Chapter | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|
Civil Code | 1941.6 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Civil Code | 1946.9 | New Code | See Bill Text |