CA SB1053 | 2023-2024 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Strong Partisan Bill (Democrat 12-1)
Status: Passed on September 22 2024 - 100% progression
Action: 2024-09-22 - Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 453, Statutes of 2024.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Strong Partisan Bill (Democrat 12-1)
Status: Passed on September 22 2024 - 100% progression
Action: 2024-09-22 - Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 453, Statutes of 2024.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
An act to amend and renumber the heading of Article 1 (commencing with Section 42280) of Chapter 5.3 of Part 3 of Division 30 of, to amend and repeal Sections 42281, 42281.5, 42282, and 42282.1 of, to amend, repeal, and add Sections 42280, 42283, 42283.5, and 42284 of, to add Article 1 (commencing with Section 42279) to Chapter 5.3 of Part 3 of Division 30 of, and to repeal Section 42283.6 of, the Public Resources Code, relating to solid waste.
Title
Solid waste: recycled paper bags: standards: carryout bag prohibition.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2024-08-30 - Senate - Unfinished Business SB1053 Blakespear et al. Concurrence (Y: 32 N: 8 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-08-29 - Assembly - SB 1053 Blakespear Senate Third Reading By Bauer-Kahan (Y: 56 N: 7 NV: 0 Abs: 16) [PASS]
2024-08-07 - Assembly - Do pass (Y: 10 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2024-07-01 - Assembly - Do pass as amended and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 9 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-05-21 - Senate - Senate 3rd Reading SB1053 Blakespear et al (Y: 31 N: 7 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2024-05-16 - Senate - Do pass as amended (Y: 5 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-05-06 - Senate - Placed on suspense file (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-04-17 - Senate - Do pass as amended, but first amend, and re-refer to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 5 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-08-29 - Assembly - SB 1053 Blakespear Senate Third Reading By Bauer-Kahan (Y: 56 N: 7 NV: 0 Abs: 16) [PASS]
2024-08-07 - Assembly - Do pass (Y: 10 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2024-07-01 - Assembly - Do pass as amended and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 9 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-05-21 - Senate - Senate 3rd Reading SB1053 Blakespear et al (Y: 31 N: 7 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2024-05-16 - Senate - Do pass as amended (Y: 5 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-05-06 - Senate - Placed on suspense file (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-04-17 - Senate - Do pass as amended, but first amend, and re-refer to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 5 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-09-22 | Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 453, Statutes of 2024. | |
2024-09-22 | Approved by the Governor. | |
2024-09-10 | Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 4 p.m. | |
2024-08-30 | Senate | Assembly amendments concurred in. (Ayes 31. Noes 8.) Ordered to engrossing and enrolling. |
2024-08-30 | Senate | In Senate. Concurrence in Assembly amendments pending. |
2024-08-29 | Assembly | Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 56. Noes 7. Page 6892.) Ordered to the Senate. |
2024-08-20 | Assembly | Ordered to third reading. |
2024-08-20 | Assembly | Read third time and amended. |
2024-08-15 | Assembly | Ordered to third reading. |
2024-08-15 | Assembly | Read third time and amended. |
2024-08-08 | Assembly | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2024-08-07 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 10. Noes 3.) (August 7). |
2024-07-03 | Assembly | Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2024-07-03 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 9. Noes 3.) (July 1). |
2024-06-20 | Assembly | From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on NAT. RES. |
2024-06-03 | Assembly | Referred to Com. on NAT. RES. |
2024-05-22 | Assembly | In Assembly. Read first time. Held at Desk. |
2024-05-21 | Senate | Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 31. Noes 7. Page 4091.) Ordered to the Assembly. |
2024-05-20 | Senate | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2024-05-16 | Senate | Read second time and amended. Ordered to second reading. |
2024-05-16 | Senate | From committee: Do pass as amended. (Ayes 5. Noes 2. Page 3969.) (May 16). |
2024-05-10 | Senate | Set for hearing May 16. |
2024-05-06 | Senate | May 6 hearing: Placed on APPR suspense file. |
2024-04-26 | Senate | Set for hearing May 6. |
2024-04-25 | Senate | April 29 hearing postponed by committee. |
2024-04-23 | Senate | Set for hearing April 29. |
2024-04-18 | Senate | Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2024-04-17 | Senate | From committee: Do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 5. Noes 2. Page 3660.) (April 17). |
2024-04-04 | Senate | From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on E.Q. |
2024-03-12 | Senate | Set for hearing April 17. |
2024-02-21 | Senate | Referred to Com. on E.Q. |
2024-02-09 | Senate | From printer. May be acted upon on or after March 10. |
2024-02-08 | Senate | Introduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print. |
Code Citations
Chapter | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|
Public Resources Code | 42280 | New Code | See Bill Text |
Public Resources Code | 42281 | New Code | See Bill Text |
Public Resources Code | 42281.5 | Repealed Code | Citation Text |
Public Resources Code | 42282 | Repealed Code | Citation Text |
Public Resources Code | 42282.1 | Repealed Code | Citation Text |
Public Resources Code | 42283 | New Code | See Bill Text |
Public Resources Code | 42283.5 | Repealed Code | Citation Text |
Public Resources Code | 42284 | Repealed Code | Citation Text |