CA SB1061 | 2023-2024 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Enrolled on August 28 2024 - 75% progression
Action: 2024-08-28 - Assembly amendments concurred in. (Ayes 31. Noes 8.) Ordered to engrossing and enrolling.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Status: Enrolled on August 28 2024 - 75% progression
Action: 2024-08-28 - Assembly amendments concurred in. (Ayes 31. Noes 8.) Ordered to engrossing and enrolling.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
An act to amend Sections 1785.3, 1785.13, 1786.18, and 1788.14 of, and to add Sections 1785.20.6 and 1785.27 to, the Civil Code, to amend Sections 1371.56, 1371.9, 1797.233, and 127425 of the Health and Safety Code, and to amend Sections 10112.8 and 10126.66 of, and to add Section 10112.75 to, the Insurance Code, relating to consumer debt.
Title
Consumer debt: medical debt.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2024-08-26 - Assembly - SB 1061 Limón Senate Third Reading By Friedman (Y: 58 N: 9 NV: 0 Abs: 12) [PASS]
2024-08-15 - Assembly - Do pass as amended (Y: 11 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2024-07-01 - Assembly - Do pass as amended and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 7 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2024-06-25 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on [Banking and Finance] (Y: 12 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2024-06-18 - Assembly - Do pass as amended and be re-referred to the Committee on [Health] (Y: 8 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2024-05-21 - Senate - Senate 3rd Reading SB1061 Limón (Y: 31 N: 8 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2024-05-16 - Senate - Do pass (Y: 5 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-05-06 - Senate - Placed on suspense file (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-04-24 - Senate - Do pass as amended, but first amend, and re-refer to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2024-04-02 - Senate - Do pass as amended, but first amend, and re-refer to the Committee on [Rules] (Y: 9 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-08-15 - Assembly - Do pass as amended (Y: 11 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2024-07-01 - Assembly - Do pass as amended and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 7 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2024-06-25 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on [Banking and Finance] (Y: 12 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2024-06-18 - Assembly - Do pass as amended and be re-referred to the Committee on [Health] (Y: 8 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2024-05-21 - Senate - Senate 3rd Reading SB1061 Limón (Y: 31 N: 8 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2024-05-16 - Senate - Do pass (Y: 5 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-05-06 - Senate - Placed on suspense file (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-04-24 - Senate - Do pass as amended, but first amend, and re-refer to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2024-04-02 - Senate - Do pass as amended, but first amend, and re-refer to the Committee on [Rules] (Y: 9 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-08-28 | Senate | Assembly amendments concurred in. (Ayes 31. Noes 8.) Ordered to engrossing and enrolling. |
2024-08-26 | Senate | In Senate. Concurrence in Assembly amendments pending. |
2024-08-26 | Assembly | Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. |
2024-08-22 | Assembly | Ordered to third reading. |
2024-08-22 | Assembly | Read third time and amended. |
2024-08-20 | Assembly | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2024-08-19 | Assembly | Read second time and amended. Ordered to second reading. |
2024-08-15 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass as amended. (Ayes 11. Noes 3.) (August 15). |
2024-08-07 | Assembly | August 7 set for first hearing. Placed on suspense file. |
2024-07-03 | Assembly | Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2024-07-02 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 7. Noes 1.) (July 1). |
2024-06-26 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on B. & F. (Ayes 12. Noes 2.) (June 25). Re-referred to Com. on B. & F. |
2024-06-19 | Assembly | Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on HEALTH. |
2024-06-18 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on HEALTH. (Ayes 8. Noes 1.) (June 18). |
2024-06-06 | Assembly | June 11 hearing postponed by committee. |
2024-06-03 | Assembly | Referred to Coms. on JUD. and HEALTH. |
2024-05-22 | Assembly | In Assembly. Read first time. Held at Desk. |
2024-05-21 | Senate | Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 31. Noes 8. Page 4097.) Ordered to the Assembly. |
2024-05-16 | Senate | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2024-05-16 | Senate | From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 5. Noes 2. Page 3969.) (May 16). |
2024-05-10 | Senate | Set for hearing May 16. |
2024-05-06 | Senate | May 6 hearing: Placed on APPR suspense file. |
2024-04-30 | Senate | Set for hearing May 6. |
2024-04-29 | Senate | Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2024-04-25 | Senate | From committee: Do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 9. Noes 0. Page 3755.) (April 24). |
2024-04-11 | Senate | Set for hearing April 24. |
2024-04-10 | Senate | Re-referred to Com. on HEALTH. |
2024-04-08 | Senate | Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on RLS. |
2024-04-04 | Senate | From committee: Do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on RLS. (Ayes 9. Noes 2. Page 3447.) (April 2). |
2024-03-11 | Senate | From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on JUD. |
2024-03-05 | Senate | Set for hearing April 2. |
2024-02-21 | Senate | Referred to Coms. on JUD. and B. & F.I. |
2024-02-09 | Senate | From printer. May be acted upon on or after March 10. |
2024-02-08 | Senate | Introduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print. |
Code Citations
Chapter | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|
Civil Code | 1785.13 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Civil Code | 1785.20.6 | New Code | See Bill Text |
Civil Code | 1785.27 | New Code | See Bill Text |
Civil Code | 1785.3 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Civil Code | 1786.18 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Civil Code | 1788.14 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Health and Safety Code | 127425 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Health and Safety Code | 1371.56 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Health and Safety Code | 1371.9 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Health and Safety Code | 1797.233 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Insurance Code | 10112.75 | New Code | See Bill Text |
Insurance Code | 10112.8 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Insurance Code | 10126.66 | Amended Code | Citation Text |