CA SB1080 | 2023-2024 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on February 12 2024 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-05-16 - May 16 hearing: Held in committee and under submission.
Pending: Senate Appropriations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on February 12 2024 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-05-16 - May 16 hearing: Held in committee and under submission.
Pending: Senate Appropriations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
An act to amend Section 49501.5 of the Education Code, relating to pupil nutrition.
Title
Pupil nutrition: school meals: halal and kosher food options.
Sponsors
Sen. Josh Newman [D] |
Roll Calls
2024-04-29 - Senate - Placed on suspense file (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2024-04-17 - Senate - Do pass, but first be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-04-17 - Senate - Do pass, but first be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-05-16 | Senate | May 16 hearing: Held in committee and under submission. |
2024-05-10 | Senate | Set for hearing May 16. |
2024-04-29 | Senate | April 29 hearing: Placed on APPR suspense file. |
2024-04-22 | Senate | Set for hearing April 29. |
2024-04-17 | Senate | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 7. Noes 0. Page 3659.) (April 17). Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2024-04-04 | Senate | Set for hearing April 17. |
2024-04-03 | Senate | Re-referred to Com. on ED. |
2024-03-14 | Senate | From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on RLS. |
2024-02-21 | Senate | Referred to Com. on RLS. |
2024-02-13 | Senate | From printer. May be acted upon on or after March 14. |
2024-02-12 | Senate | Introduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print. |
Code Citations
Chapter | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|
Education Code | 49501.5 | Amended Code | Citation Text |