CA SB1086 | 2011-2012 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Introduced on February 15 2012 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2012-05-09 - Set, first hearing. Failed passage in committee. (Ayes 3. Noes 6. Page 3457.) Reconsideration granted.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on February 15 2012 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2012-05-09 - Set, first hearing. Failed passage in committee. (Ayes 3. Noes 6. Page 3457.) Reconsideration granted.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
An act to add Section 6012.4 to the Revenue and Taxation Code, relating to taxation, to take effect immediately, tax levy.
Title
Sales and use taxes: wireless communication devices:
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2012-05-09 - Senate - Set, first hearing. Failed passage in Committee. Reconsideration granted (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-05-09 - Senate - Do pass, but re-refer to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 3 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2012-05-09 - Senate - Do pass, but re-refer to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 3 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2012-05-09 | Set, first hearing. Failed passage in committee. (Ayes 3. Noes 6. Page 3457.) Reconsideration granted. | |
2012-04-09 | From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on GOV. & F. | |
2012-03-28 | Set for hearing May 9. | |
2012-03-27 | Hearing postponed by committee. | |
2012-03-22 | Set for hearing April 25. | |
2012-03-21 | Hearing postponed by committee. | |
2012-03-01 | Referred to Com. on GOV. & F. | |
2012-02-16 | From printer. May be acted upon on or after March 17. | |
2012-02-15 | Introduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print. |
Code Citations
Chapter | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|
Revenue and Taxation Code | 6012.4 | New Code | See Bill Text |