CA SB1096 | 2011-2012 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on September 7 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-09-07 - Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 271, Statutes of 2012.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on September 7 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-09-07 - Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 271, Statutes of 2012.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
An act to amend Sections 8251, 8252, 8252.5, 8253, and 8253.6 of the Government Code, relating to redistricting.
Title
Citizens Redistricting Commission.
Sponsors
Sen. Lou Correa [D] | Sen. Kevin de Leon [D] | Sen. Ted Gaines [R] | Sen. Doug La Malfa [R] |
Sen. Ted Lieu [D] |
Roll Calls
2012-08-16 - Assembly - SB 1096 E.& C.A. Consent Calendar Second Day Regular Session (Y: 79 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2012-08-08 - Assembly - Do pass, to Consent Calendar (Y: 17 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-07-03 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2012-05-10 - Senate - Consent Calendar 2nd SB1096 Committee on E.& C.A. (Correa) (Y: 37 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-04-19 - Senate - Do pass and be placed on the Consent Calendar (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-08-08 - Assembly - Do pass, to Consent Calendar (Y: 17 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-07-03 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2012-05-10 - Senate - Consent Calendar 2nd SB1096 Committee on E.& C.A. (Correa) (Y: 37 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-04-19 - Senate - Do pass and be placed on the Consent Calendar (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2012-09-07 | Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 271, Statutes of 2012. | |
2012-09-07 | Approved by the Governor. | |
2012-08-20 | Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 4:30 p.m. | |
2012-08-16 | In Senate. Ordered to engrossing and enrolling. | |
2012-08-16 | Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 79. Noes 0. Page 5967.) Ordered to the Senate. | |
2012-08-13 | Read second time. Ordered to consent calendar. | |
2012-08-09 | From committee: Do pass. Ordered to consent calendar. (Ayes 17. Noes 0.) (August 8). | |
2012-07-05 | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 5. Noes 0.) (July 3). Re-referred to Com. on APPR. | |
2012-06-19 | Set, first hearing. Hearing canceled at the request of author. | |
2012-05-17 | Referred to Com. on E. & R. | |
2012-05-10 | In Assembly. Read first time. Held at Desk. | |
2012-05-10 | Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 37. Noes 0. Page 3472.) Ordered to the Assembly. | |
2012-05-08 | Read second time. Ordered to consent calendar. | |
2012-05-07 | From committee: Be placed on second reading file pursuant to Senate Rule 28.8 and ordered to consent calendar. | |
2012-05-01 | From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR. | |
2012-04-27 | Set for hearing May 7. | |
2012-04-23 | Read second time. Ordered to consent calendar. Re-referred to Com. on APPR. pursuant to Joint Rule 10.5. | |
2012-04-19 | From committee: Do pass. Ordered to consent calendar. (Ayes 5. Noes 0. Page 3232.) (April 19). | |
2012-04-12 | From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on E. & C.A. | |
2012-03-29 | Set for hearing April 19. | |
2012-03-22 | Re-referred to Com. on E. & C.A. | |
2012-03-20 | From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on RLS. | |
2012-03-01 | Referred to Com. on RLS. | |
2012-02-17 | From printer. May be acted upon on or after March 18. | |
2012-02-16 | Introduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print. (Corrected February 17.) |
Code Citations
Chapter | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|
Government Code | 8251 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Government Code | 8252 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Government Code | 8252.5 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Government Code | 8253 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Government Code | 8253.6 | Amended Code | Citation Text |