CA SB1096 | 2013-2014 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Engrossed on April 28 2014 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2014-08-26 - From Assembly without further action.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on April 28 2014 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2014-08-26 - From Assembly without further action.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
An act to repeal Section 6244 of the Public Resources Code, relating to coastal sanctuary.
Title
Coastal sanctuary: State Lands Commission: oil and gas leases.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2014-08-26 - Assembly - SB 1096 Jackson Senate Third Reading By WILLIAMS (Y: 30 N: 36 NV: 0 Abs: 13) [FAIL]
2014-08-14 - Assembly - Do pass (Y: 10 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2014-06-26 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 6 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2014-06-19 - Assembly - Be referred to Committee on Natural Resources (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-04-28 - Senate - Consent Calendar 2nd SB1096 Jackson (Y: 36 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-04-22 - Senate - Do pass and be placed on the Consent Calendar (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-08-14 - Assembly - Do pass (Y: 10 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2014-06-26 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 6 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2014-06-19 - Assembly - Be referred to Committee on Natural Resources (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-04-28 - Senate - Consent Calendar 2nd SB1096 Jackson (Y: 36 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-04-22 - Senate - Do pass and be placed on the Consent Calendar (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-08-26 | Assembly | From Assembly without further action. |
2014-08-26 | Assembly | Read third time. Refused passage. (Ayes 30. Noes 36. Page 6495.) |
2014-08-18 | Assembly | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2014-08-14 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 10. Noes 6.) (August 14). |
2014-08-06 | Assembly | Set, first hearing. Referred to APPR. suspense file. |
2014-07-03 | Assembly | From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2014-06-26 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 6. Noes 2.) (June 26). Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2014-06-23 | Assembly | Joint Rule 62(a) file notice suspended. (Page 5641.) Hearing postponed by committee. |
2014-06-19 | Assembly | From committee: Be re-referred to Com. on NAT. RES. (Ayes 11. Noes 0.) (June 19). Re-referred to Com. on NAT. RES. |
2014-06-16 | Assembly | From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on NAT. RES. Re-referred to Com. on RLS. pursuant to Assembly Rule 96(a). (Ayes 55. Noes 20. Page 5544.) . |
2014-06-10 | Assembly | Set, first hearing. Hearing canceled at the request of author. |
2014-05-15 | Assembly | Referred to Com. on NAT. RES. |
2014-04-28 | Assembly | In Assembly. Read first time. Held at Desk. |
2014-04-28 | Senate | Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 36. Noes 0. Page 3270.) Ordered to the Assembly. |
2014-04-23 | Senate | Read second time. Ordered to consent calendar. |
2014-04-22 | Senate | From committee: Do pass. Ordered to consent calendar. (Ayes 9. Noes 0. Page 3215.) (April 22). |
2014-03-27 | Senate | Set for hearing April 22. |
2014-02-27 | Senate | Referred to Com. on N.R. & W. |
2014-02-20 | Senate | From printer. May be acted upon on or after March 22. |
2014-02-19 | Senate | Introduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print. |
Code Citations
Chapter | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|
Public Resources Code | 30310.5 | Repealed Code | Citation Text |
Public Resources Code | 6244 | Repealed Code | Citation Text |