CA SB1099 | 2011-2012 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 10-4)
Status: Passed on September 11 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-09-11 - Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 295, Statutes of 2012.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 10-4)
Status: Passed on September 11 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-09-11 - Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 295, Statutes of 2012.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
An act to amend Sections 11343, 11343.4, and 11344 of the Government Code, and to amend Section 116064 of the Health and Safety Code, relating to regulations.
Title
Regulations.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2012-08-29 - Senate - Unfinished Business SB1099 Wright Concurrence (Y: 32 N: 0 NV: 8 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-08-28 - Assembly - SB 1099 Wright Senate Third Reading By PEREA (Y: 79 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2012-08-16 - Assembly - Do pass (Y: 17 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-06-19 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-05-25 - Senate - Senate 3rd Reading SB1099 Wright (Y: 33 N: 0 NV: 7 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-05-07 - Senate - Do pass as amended (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-04-23 - Senate - Do pass as amended, and re-refer to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-03-27 - Senate - Do pass, but re-refer to the Committee on Environmental Quality (Y: 9 N: 1 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-08-28 - Assembly - SB 1099 Wright Senate Third Reading By PEREA (Y: 79 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2012-08-16 - Assembly - Do pass (Y: 17 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-06-19 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-05-25 - Senate - Senate 3rd Reading SB1099 Wright (Y: 33 N: 0 NV: 7 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-05-07 - Senate - Do pass as amended (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-04-23 - Senate - Do pass as amended, and re-refer to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-03-27 - Senate - Do pass, but re-refer to the Committee on Environmental Quality (Y: 9 N: 1 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2012-09-11 | Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 295, Statutes of 2012. | |
2012-09-11 | Approved by the Governor. | |
2012-09-06 | Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 11:30 a.m. | |
2012-08-29 | Assembly amendments concurred in. (Ayes 32. Noes 0. Page 4970.) Ordered to engrossing and enrolling. | |
2012-08-28 | In Senate. Concurrence in Assembly amendments pending. | |
2012-08-28 | Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 79. Noes 0. Page 6448.) Ordered to the Senate. | |
2012-08-24 | Read third time and amended. (Page 6252.) Ordered to third reading. | |
2012-08-20 | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. | |
2012-08-16 | From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 17. Noes 0.) (August 16). | |
2012-08-08 | Set, first hearing. Referred to APPR. suspense file. | |
2012-06-19 | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 9. Noes 0.) (June 19). Re-referred to Com. on APPR. | |
2012-06-04 | Referred to Com. on B., P. & C.P. | |
2012-05-25 | In Assembly. Read first time. Held at Desk. | |
2012-05-25 | Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 33. Noes 0. Page 3615.) Ordered to the Assembly. | |
2012-05-17 | Read second time and amended. Ordered to third reading. | |
2012-05-16 | From committee: Do pass as amended. (Ayes 7. Noes 0. Page 3445.) (May 7). | |
2012-04-27 | Set for hearing May 7. | |
2012-04-25 | Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR. | |
2012-04-24 | From committee: Do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 7. Noes 0. Page 3261.) (April 23). | |
2012-04-05 | Set for hearing April 23. | |
2012-03-27 | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on E.Q. (Ayes 9. Noes 1. Page 3021.) (March 27). Re-referred to Com. on E.Q. | |
2012-03-20 | Set for hearing March 27. | |
2012-03-01 | Referred to Coms. on G.O. and E.Q. | |
2012-02-17 | From printer. May be acted upon on or after March 18. | |
2012-02-16 | Introduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print. |
Code Citations
Chapter | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|
Government Code | 11343 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Government Code | 11343.4 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Government Code | 11344 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Health and Safety Code | 116064 | Amended Code | Citation Text |